BALESTRIERI v. USA

Plaintiff: JOHN BALESTRIERI
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2010cv00886
Filed: December 29, 2010
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
Nature of Suit: Civilian Pay, Back Pay
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery completed by 12/1/2011. Expert Discovery completed by 3/30/2112. Joint Status Report due by 4/17/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties. (Modified on 6/20/2011 - corrected order text(jt1).
April 20, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER:Brief due by 5/18/2012. Cross Motions due by 6/15/2012. Reply due by 7/13/2012. Response due by 7/27/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 28, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Oral Argument set for 12/14/2012 at 10:00 AM (EST) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 4, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE: Joint Status Report due by 11/27/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 2, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2014, and every 63 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
January 11, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
June 7, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order. Preliminary Status Conference set for 6/17/2011 at 4:00 PM (EDT) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BALESTRIERI v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN BALESTRIERI
Represented By: Michael J. Kator
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Cameron Cohick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]