HALLMARK-PHOENIX 3, LLC v. USA

Plaintiff: HALLMARK-PHOENIX 3, LLC
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00098
Filed: February 16, 2011
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
March 7, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Amend Schedule. Administrative Record on CD-ROM due by 3/15/2011; Response to motion to dismiss due by 3/29/2011; Reply to motion to dismiss due by 4/5/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)Copy to parties.
April 8, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion. Oral Argument set for 4/28/2011 at 2:00 PM (EDT) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
April 15, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 27 plaintiff filed a motion for preliminary injunction. Plaintiff shall file a statement with the court explaining whether that is still its understanding or whether, instead, its filing of a motion for preliminary injunction reflects either changed circumstances or, at least, a change in its position regarding how this case should proceed. Notice of Compliance due by 4/18/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 2, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction by 5/6/2011. Plaintiff shall file its reply to defendant's response by 5/12/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 24, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION re: 41 Opinion filed under sealed. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 25, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ERRATA: Opinion filed on May 24, 2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
February 16, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/18/2011 at 2:00 PM (EST) telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: HALLMARK-PHOENIX 3, LLC v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HALLMARK-PHOENIX 3, LLC
Represented By: Bryant Steven Banes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Bowen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]