NETSTAR-1 GOVERNMENT CONSULTING, INC v. USA

Plaintiff: NETSTAR-1 GOVERNMENT CONSULTING, INC
Defendant: USA
Intervenor_defendant: ALON, INC.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00294
Filed: May 11, 2011
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2011 18 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 16, 2011 19 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER re:Preliminary Injunction: Administrative Record on CD-ROM due by 5/18/2011. Response due by 5/20/2011. Reply due by 5/24/2011. Oral Argument set for 5/26/2011 at 12:30 PM (EDT) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 25, 2011 24 Featured Case ORDER: Time allotment for oral argument scheduled for May 26, 2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 2, 2011 29 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER:Parties simultaneously file their respective motions for judgment on the administrative record due by 6/29/2011. Parties shall simultaneously file their Responses to opposing motions for judgment on the administrative record by 7/29/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 13, 2011 33 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION AND ORDER. Redacted re: 27 SEALED OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 30, 2011 38 Featured Case ORDER Striking 34 Motion for Permanent Injunction and 35 memorandum in support of plaintiffs motion for permanent injunctive relief and judgment on the administrative record. Plaintiff shall file a corrected motion for judgment on the administrative record with attached memorandum by 7/1/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
August 10, 2011 52 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion. Oral Argument set for 9/14/2011 at 10:00 AM (EDT) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
August 10, 2011 53 Featured Case ORDER directing plaintiff to respond to 51 defendant notice of corrective action and motion to dismiss. Response due by 8/17/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
August 19, 2011 57 Featured Case ORDER denying 51 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1). Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis) Copy to parties.
September 6, 2011 59 Featured Case ORDER re: 52 Oral argument on the parties motions for judgment on the administrative record. Plaintiff and defendant will be limited to forty-five minutes per side and defendant-intervenor will be limited to fifteen minutes. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 14, 2011 65 Featured Case ORDER re: 62 plaintiff's motion to redact and 63 defendant's motion to redact. The court will treat these motions as notices to redacted and will address both accordingly. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 17, 2011 66 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: NETSTAR-1 GOVERNMENT CONSULTING, INC v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NETSTAR-1 GOVERNMENT CONSULTING, INC
Represented By: John J. O'Brien
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Daniel B. Volk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: ALON, INC.
Represented By: Douglas Leo Patin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]