COMINT SYSTEMS CORPORATION AND EYEIT.COM, INC., JOINT VENTURE v. USA

Plaintiff: COMINT SYSTEMS CORPORATION AND EYEIT.COM, INC., JOINT VENTURE
Defendant: USA
Intervenor_defendant: NETCENTRICS CORPORATION, DIGITAL MANAGEMENT, INC. and POWERTEK CORPORATION
Consolidated_plaintiff: NETSERVICES & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv00400
Filed: June 20, 2011
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Margaret M. Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION granting 99 Plaintiff NetServices' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. NetServices shall file its second amended complaint in accordance with the deadline to be set by the court in an order that adjudicates plaintiffs' second motions to supplement and resolves all issues concerning the contents of the administrative record. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (rac)
December 19, 2011 158 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION (originally filed under seal on December 2, 2011). Reissued for publication. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (rac)
July 22, 2011 86 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION (originally filed under seal on July 15, 2011). Reissued for publication. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (rac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMINT SYSTEMS CORPORATION AND EYEIT.COM, INC., JOINT VENTURE v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMINT SYSTEMS CORPORATION AND EYEIT.COM, INC., JOINT VENTURE
Represented By: Philip F. Hudock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Alexander V. Sverdlov
Represented By: Steven Michael Mager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: NETCENTRICS CORPORATION
Represented By: Jeremy William Dutra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: DIGITAL MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: David Phillip Metzger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: POWERTEK CORPORATION
Represented By: Gerard Francis Doyle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: NETSERVICES & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: David B. Dempsey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]