GEO GROUP, INC., THE v. USA

Plaintiff: GEO GROUP, INC., THE
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00490
Filed: July 27, 2011
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/28/2011 at 2:00 PM (EDT) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
July 28, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/2/2011 at 2:00 PM (EDT) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
July 28, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant and defendant-intervenor shall file their respective responses on 7/29/2011 at 12:00 p.m.(EDT). Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
August 1, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
August 1, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record due by 8/4/2011. Motion to supplement the administrative record, if any, due by 8/8/2011. Motion for judgment on the administrative record due by 8/26/2011. Cross Motions due by 9/16/2011. Reply due by 9/30/2011. Response due by 9/23/2011. All briefing deadlines applicable to defendant shall apply likewise to defendant-intervenor. Oral Argument set for 10/5/2011 at 10:00 AM (EDT) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
August 9, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED ORDER(Redacted)re: 25 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties. Modified on 8/9/2011 - corrected pdf(jt1).
October 5, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Each party shall file a memorandum, not to exceed ten pages in length, addressing the issue whether this court may issue declaratory relief without addressing the traditional factors for issuing an injunction. Notice of Compliance due by 10/12/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
April 23, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff and defendant shall file surreplies responding to the specific claims made by defendant-intervenor in its reply. Surreplies due by 5/4/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 24, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting, in part, and denying, in part 66 Motion for Leave to file a response to the sur-replies and to file a copy of a modified protective order that the plaintiff and the defendant-intervenor have moved the court to adopt in their case in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. The Clerk shall file the proposed protective order attached to defendant-intervenors motion. Defendant-intervenor shall file a notification with the court within one week after the district court acts on the motion to modify the protective order. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 7, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Motion to Amend Protective Order. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: GEO GROUP, INC., THE v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEO GROUP, INC., THE
Represented By: Matthew H. Kirtland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Devin Andrew Wolak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]