ENSLEY, INC v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: ENSLEY, INC
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00682
Filed: October 14, 2011
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Lynn J. Bush
Referring Judge: John P. Wiese
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time. Summary Motion(s) due by 8/7/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
August 5, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time. Absent extraordinary circumstances, defendant shall not be granted any further opposed enlargements of time for filing its motion for summary judgment. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/29/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
September 30, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 24 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/30/2013 to File Response as to 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response due by 10/30/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
November 8, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/26/2013 to File Reply as to 26 Response to Motion [Dispositive], , 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Reply due by 11/26/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
February 25, 2014 30 Featured Case REPORTED OPINION granting 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ENSLEY, INC v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENSLEY, INC
Represented By: Lawrence M. Magdovitz, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]