TRINCO INVESTMENT COMPANY et al v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN G. ROSE and TRINCO INVESTMENT COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2011cv00857
Filed: December 7, 2011
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Bohdan A. Futey
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Preliminary Status Report due by 10/23/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 25, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order Telephonic Preliminary Status Conference set for 11/7/2013 at 2:00 PM (EST)before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 7, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties shall exchange initial disclosures by 12/6/2013. Fact Discovery complete by 6/9/2014. Plaintiffs shall disclose their expert reports on liability by 7/25/2014. Defendant shall disclose its exp ert reports on liability by 8/8/2014. Parties shall exchange rebuttal reports on liability by 9/12/2014. Parties shall complete depositions of experts by 10/24/2014. Joint Status Report due by 11/7/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRINCO INVESTMENT COMPANY et al v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Jessica Michelle Held
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN G. ROSE
Represented By: Wesley R. Higbie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRINCO INVESTMENT COMPANY
Represented By: Wesley R. Higbie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]