SUPERIOR ELECTRIC HOLDING GROUP, LLC v. USA

Intervenor_defendant: WARD LEONARD ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.
Plaintiff: SUPERIOR ELECTRIC HOLDING GROUP, LLC
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2012cv00214
Filed: April 2, 2012
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record due by 4/30/2012. Brief due by 5/23/2012. Cross Motions due by 6/6/2012. Reply due by 6/20/2012. Defendant Reply Brief due by 7/6/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 7, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: directing plaintiff and defendant to file responses to 28 motion to supplement the administrative record. Responses due by 6/14/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 14, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 22 MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record : Oral Argument set for 8/7/2012 at 10:00 AM (EDT)in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 18, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis) Copy to parties.
August 15, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Clerk is directed to dismiss the complaint, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
April 3, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/4/2012 at 10:00 AM (EDT)before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUPERIOR ELECTRIC HOLDING GROUP, LLC v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: WARD LEONARD ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: John H. Horne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUPERIOR ELECTRIC HOLDING GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Frederick W. Claybrook, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Witwer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]