TDX CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: TDX CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2012cv00798
Filed: November 19, 2012
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
Nature of Suit: Tax - Income, Corporate

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order: A Telephonic Preliminary Status Conference set for 5/24/2013 at 2:00 PM (EDT) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 9, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court RESCHEDULING PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Status Conference set for 5/23/2013 at 2:00 PM (EDT) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
June 5, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery complete by 2/21/2014. Disclose identities of initial expert witnesses by 3/7/2014. Exchange initial expert reports by 4/7/2014. Disclose identities and expert reports of rebuttal expert witnesses by 5/30/14. Complete depositions of experts by 7/11/2014. Joint Status Report due by 7/25/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties. Modified on 6/5/2013 - corrected entry(jt1).
December 5, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
January 9, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 3/19/2013. No further enlargements of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TDX CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TDX CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION
Represented By: Ira B. Stechel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]