INSIGHT SYSTEMS CORP. v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: INSIGHT SYSTEMS CORP.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00863
Filed: December 11, 2012
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Contract - (Pre Award) Injunctions

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2012 10 Featured Case STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/13/2012 at 10:00 AM (EST)before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 14, 2012 11 Featured Case SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 18, 2012 13 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER:(it was filed in a wrong case). Proposed Protective Order due 12/17/2012. Joint Status Report due by 12/19/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 18, 2012 14 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 19, 2012 18 Featured Case STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/20/2012 at 2:00 PM (EST) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 21, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER:Today, this court filed an order directing the Clerk to consolidate this case with case No. 12-883C. Accordingly, all further filings should be filed under the lead case, No. 12-863C. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 21, 2012 21 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record in CD-ROM due by 1/8/2013. Brief due by 1/22/2013. Cross Motions due by 2/5/2013. Reply to their motions and response due 2/15/2013. Replies in support of its cross-motions due 2/25/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
January 17, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER granting, in part, and denying, in part, as moot 23 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties. (Main Document 34 replaced on 1/17/2013) (ac7).
January 17, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER granting 26 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
January 17, 2013 36 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Brief due by 1/25/2013. Cross Motions due by 2/8/2013. Replies in support of their motions and responses due by 2/18/2013. Replies in support of its cross-motions due by 2/28/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
February 1, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER granting 40 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record; granting 42 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
February 1, 2013 45 Featured Case AMEND 36 SCHEDULING ORDER: Cross Motions due by 2/8/2013. Replies due by 2/19/2013. Replies in support of its cross-motions due by 3/1/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
February 12, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 47 CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to 41 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by INSIGHT SYSTEMS CORP. 39 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by CENTERSCOPE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.: Oral Argument set for 3/5/2013 at 10:00 AM (EST)in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 6, 2013 57 Featured Case PUBLISHED (Reissued) OPINION. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis) Copy to parties.
July 25, 2013 61 Featured Case ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 58 MOTION for Attorney Fees , 59 MOTION for Attorney Fees , 60 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/18/2013 to File Response as to 59 MOTION for Attorney Fees , 58 MOTION for Attorney Fees DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR AT; Response due by 9/18/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: INSIGHT SYSTEMS CORP. v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Matthew Paul Roche
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INSIGHT SYSTEMS CORP.
Represented By: Richard J. Webber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]