FARRELL et al v. USA

Plaintiff: NANCY FARRELL and TIM FARRELL
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00909
Filed: December 26, 2012
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Contract - Construction (CDA)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defendant to file a response to 13 NOTICE re 12 Response to Motion [Dispositive] Request for Judicial Notice. Response due by 8/8/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
August 9, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 13 Request for Judicial Notice. The court will take judicial notice of the filing of the complaint identified in plaintiffs' request. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
January 22, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
February 19, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Response due 4/26/2013. No further enlargements of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
April 17, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defendant to file its response to 8 Amended Complaint. Response to Plaintiff's amended complaint due by 6/17/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: FARRELL et al v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY FARRELL
Represented By: Arthur Mooney Bistline
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIM FARRELL
Represented By: Arthur Mooney Bistline
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Matthew Paul Roche
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]