ROBERTS et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Featured Case

Petitioner: KATIE ROBERTS and E.M.R.
Respondent: SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
 
Case Number: 1:2012vv00099
Filed: February 10, 2012
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Referring Judge: Gary J. Golkiewicz
 
Nature of Suit: Deportation
Cause of Action: 42:300
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion to Issue Subpoena Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (ds8) Copy to parties.
March 16, 2012 7 MOTION to Issue Subpoena, filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 4/2/2012. (Kalinowski, Isaiah)
March 16, 2012 6 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file within sixty (60) days, by no later than May 15, 2012, petitioners medical records, affidavits and a Statement of Completion regarding the filing of records. Respondents Rule 4(c) Report filing deadline is amended to ninety (90) days after the filing of the Statement of Completion. Petitioner shall confer with respondent and contact the undersigneds office within ten (10) days of the filing of the Rule 4(c) Report to schedule a status conference. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (ds8) Copy to parties.
February 20, 2012 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Justine Elizabeth Daigneault for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.. (Daigneault, Justine)
February 17, 2012 4 INITIAL ORDER Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (dlb) Copy to parties.
February 10, 2012 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk)
February 10, 2012 2 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (tjk)
February 10, 2012 1 PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $350, Receipt number 073362) [Vaccination date: 2/11/09], filed by KATIE ROBERTS, E.M.R..Respondents Report due by 5/10/2012. (tjk) (tjk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ROBERTS et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KATIE ROBERTS
Represented By: Isaiah Richard Kalinowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: E.M.R.
Represented By: Isaiah Richard Kalinowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Justine Elizabeth Daigneault
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]