PUBLIC HOUSING AUTHORITIES DIRECTORS ASSOCIATION et al v. USA

Plaintiff: PLUMAS COUNTY COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT COMMISSION AND HOUSING AUTHORITY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOUSING AND REDEVELOPMENT OFFICIALS, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF CARBON HILL, HUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF DOTHAN, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF ENTERPRISE, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF TUSKEGEE, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF FRESNO, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF MADERA, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF MERCED, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF STANISLAUS, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF WINFIELD, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KINGS, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF BUTTE, RUSSELLVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF GREENE COUNTY, ALEXANDER CITY HOUSING AUTHORITY, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF SANTA BARBARA, OZARK HOUSING COMMUNITY, MONTGOMERY HOUSING AUTHORITY, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF CHICKASAW, PUBLIC HOUSING AUTHORITIES DIRECTORS ASSOCIATION, HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO and HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF FRESNO
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00006
Filed: January 3, 2013
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Contract - Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER: Briefing on defendant's motion for partial summary judgment is hereby STAYED until further order. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
July 3, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER: The Clerk is ordered to sever the claims of each of the 358 plaintiffs listed on the Amended Complaint after Public Housing Authorities Directors Association. The Clerk shall treat the claims of each of these plaintiffs as separate actions and shall assign separate docket numbers to each case. Pursuant to RCFC 42, these newly-created cases shall be consolidated for all purposes with Public Housing Authorities Directors Association v. United States, 13-00006C, unless otherwise ordered by t he court, and all future filings in this matter shall be filed under the consolidated caption, unless otherwise ordered by the court. Plaintiffs' counsel shall remit to the court the filing fees of $350 for each of the newly-created cases due by 8/5/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 15, 2013 21 Featured Case PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order: Preliminary Status Conference set for 12/4/2013 at 2:00 PM (EST) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 5, 2013 22 Featured Case DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Written Fact Discovery completed by 6/20/2014. Joints Status Report due by 8/8/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
January 29, 2013 6 Featured Case SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
March 4, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER re: 8 Amended Complaint. Response due by 5/2/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: PUBLIC HOUSING AUTHORITIES DIRECTORS ASSOCIATION et al v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PLUMAS COUNTY COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT COMMISSION AND HOUSING AUTHORITY
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOUSING AND REDEVELOPMENT OFFICIALS
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF CARBON HILL
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF DOTHAN
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF ENTERPRISE
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF TUSKEGEE
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF FRESNO
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF MADERA
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF MERCED
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF STANISLAUS
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF WINFIELD
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF KINGS
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF BUTTE
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELLVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF GREENE COUNTY
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER CITY HOUSING AUTHORITY
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF NORTH LITTLE ROCK
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF SANTA BARBARA
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OZARK HOUSING COMMUNITY
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTGOMERY HOUSING AUTHORITY
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF CHICKASAW
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUBLIC HOUSING AUTHORITIES DIRECTORS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF FRESNO
Represented By: Carl A.S.. Coan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Ellen Mary Lynch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]