YUCCA VALLEY OASIS II, LIMITED v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: YUCCA VALLEY OASIS II, LIMITED
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00024
Filed: January 14, 2013
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Referring Judge: Eric G. Bruggink
Presiding Judge: Lynn J. Bush
 
Nature of Suit: Contract - Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 6/14/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
June 14, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 8/13/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
October 8, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time. JPSR due by 12/3/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
December 3, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time. JPSR due by 2/3/2014. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: YUCCA VALLEY OASIS II, LIMITED v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Matthew Paul Roche
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YUCCA VALLEY OASIS II, LIMITED
Represented By: Jeff Howard Eckland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]