DYNAMICS RESEARCH CORPORATION v. USA

Plaintiff: DYNAMICS RESEARCH CORPORATION
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2013cv00048
Filed: January 18, 2013
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: Lynn J. Bush
Referring Judge: Bohdan A. Futey
Nature of Suit: Contract - Other (CDA)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,Answer due by 9/3/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
August 30, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 11/1/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
November 5, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,Answer due by 12/2/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DYNAMICS RESEARCH CORPORATION v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DYNAMICS RESEARCH CORPORATION
Represented By: Brian A. Bannon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Robert C. Bigler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]