APTERYX, INC v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: APTERYX, INC
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00117
Filed: February 13, 2013
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: George W. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Contract - Other (CDA)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
August 13, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order: Telephonic Preliminary Status Conference set for 8/27/2013 at 10:00 AM (EDT) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
August 27, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery completed by 2/14/2014. Joint Status Report due by 2/21/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 20, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact Discovery complete by 6/13/2014. Joint Status Report due by 6/20/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
December 24, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Discovery "Claw Back" Order. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis) Copy to parties.
July 8, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court UNREPORTED ORDER. Status Report due by 8/11/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: APTERYX, INC v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Ryan Michael Majerus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APTERYX, INC
Represented By: Richard Eric Gaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]