SMITH v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: ROY SMITH
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00161
Filed: March 4, 2013
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: Victor J. Wolski
 
Nature of Suit: Civilian Pay - FLSA

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion to Stay Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jg) Copy to parties.
August 11, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court UNREPORTED ORDER granting 30 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jg) Copy to parties.
August 11, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court UNREPORTED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Certify Class; (Joint Status Report due by 9/2/2014). Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jg) Copy to parties.
September 17, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court UNREPORTED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Stay (Status Report due by 9/24/2014). Signed by Judge Victor J. Wolski. (jd) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: SMITH v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Joshua A. Mandlebaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROY SMITH
Represented By: Charles Ryan Morgan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]