COMPLIANCE SOLUTIONS OCCUPATIONAL TRAINERS, INC. v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: COMPLIANCE SOLUTIONS OCCUPATIONAL TRAINERS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00194
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
Nature of Suit: Contract - Service (CDA)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
May 7, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Response due by 6/13/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 16, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION(Redacted) re: 22 Sealed Opinion of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
March 21, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting, in part, and denying, in part 6 Motion to file this case under seal. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMPLIANCE SOLUTIONS OCCUPATIONAL TRAINERS, INC. v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Robert C. Bigler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMPLIANCE SOLUTIONS OCCUPATIONAL TRAINERS, INC.
Represented By: Theodore P. Watson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]