PALAFOX STREET ASSOCIATES, L.P. v. USA

Plaintiff: PALAFOX STREET ASSOCIATES, L.P.
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00247
Filed: April 8, 2013
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: George W. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Contract - Lease (CDA)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2013 11 Featured Case SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 21, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER LIFTING STAY. Reply due 10/29/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
February 12, 2014 20 Featured Case REPORTED OPINION on 7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and (6) filed by USA granting in part, staying in part, and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) and (6). Defendant shall file a supplemental brief o n or before February 24, 2014; plaintiff shall respond to defendant's brief on or before March 3, 2014; and defendant may file a reply to plaintiff's response on or before March 7, 2014. Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (ss5) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: PALAFOX STREET ASSOCIATES, L.P. v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PALAFOX STREET ASSOCIATES, L.P.
Represented By: Nick Rudolf Hoogstraten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Joshua A. Mandlebaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]