KEPA DAKOTA, JV v. USA

Plaintiff: KEPA DAKOTA, JV
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2013cv00255
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
Nature of Suit: Contract - Construction (CDA)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER denying 7 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6), and instead converts that motion to one for summary judgment under RCFC 56. The court thereupon DENIES the converted motion. Joint Status Report due by 10/8/2014, indicating how this case should proceed. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties. Docketed for Administrative Purposes Only. (jb)
April 22, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
July 24, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) , 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/08/2013 to File Response as to 7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) ; Response due by 8/8/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEPA DAKOTA, JV v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEPA DAKOTA, JV
Represented By: William Lee Bruckner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Barbara E. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]