U.S. HOME CORPORATION et al v. USA

Plaintiff: BEECHWOOD SHOPPING CENTER LLC, BEECHWOOD AT EDISON, LLC and U.S. HOME CORPORATION
Defendant: USA
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00434
Filed: June 28, 2013
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Referring Judge: Eric G. Bruggink
Presiding Judge: Lynn J. Bush
 
Nature of Suit: Contract - Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE( Show Cause Response due by 10/24/2013.), ORDER Striking 11 Response to Motion [Dispositive]. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
October 18, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER NOTICE granting re: 13 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented) pursuant to Rule 83.1(c)(4). Added attorney Brian Samuel Wolfson for BEECHWOOD AT EDISON, LLC,Brian Samuel Wolfson for BEECHWOOD SHOPPING CENTER LLC,Brian Samuel Wolfson for U.S. HOME CORPORATION. Attorney Andrew Ullrich terminated. Entered by the Clerk. Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss due to be filed by 10/22/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
April 8, 2014 17 Featured Case UNREPORTED OPINION. granting 10 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) and (6). The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
August 20, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER. The Clerks Office is directed to SERVE a copy of this order, via regular mail, to Andrew Ullrich, Esq., Weingarten Law Firm LLC, 1260 Stelton Road, Piscataway, NJ 08854. The attorney admission process shall be COMPLETED by September 13, 2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: U.S. HOME CORPORATION et al v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEECHWOOD SHOPPING CENTER LLC
Represented By: Andrew Ullrich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEECHWOOD AT EDISON, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Ullrich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. HOME CORPORATION
Represented By: Andrew Ullrich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Veronica Nicole Onyema
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]