LYON SHIPYARD, INC. v. USA

Plaintiff: LYON SHIPYARD, INC.
Defendant: USA
Intervenor_defendant: DAVIS BOAT WORKS, INC.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00508
Filed: July 25, 2013
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
 
Nature of Suit: Contract - (Post Award) Injunction

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2013 14 Featured Case SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
July 26, 2013 15 Featured Case STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/29/2013 at 2:00 PM (EDT) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
July 29, 2013 17 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record (on CD-ROM) due by 7/31/2013. Response due at 12:00 p.m. by 8/2/2013. Reply due by 8/5/2013. Oral Argument set for 8/7/2013 at 10:00 AM (EDT)in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
July 30, 2013 22 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
July 30, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Motion to Intervene. All briefing deadlines applicable to defendant shall apply likewise to defendant-intervenor Davis Boat Works, Inc.(DBW). Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 6, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER re: 34 MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record and Memorandum in Support.Notice of Compliance due by 9/11/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 27, 2013 54 Featured Case PUBLISHED OPINION re: 51 Sealed Opinion. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: LYON SHIPYARD, INC. v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYON SHIPYARD, INC.
Represented By: Michael John Gardner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: John Bryan Warnock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: DAVIS BOAT WORKS, INC.
Represented By: Daniel Richard Weckstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]