JORDAN POND COMPANY, LLC v. USA

Intervenor_defendant: DAWNLAND, LLC
Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: JORDAN POND COMPANY, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00913
Filed: November 20, 2013
 
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Lynn J. Bush
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Amend/Correct. Defendant and Intervenor-Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File its First Amended Complaint shall be FILED by 5:00 p.m., eastern time on 1/2/201 4; Defendant and Intervenor-Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Motion Seeking an Order for Defendant to Include All Relevant Decision Documents in the Administrative Record shall be FILED by 5:00 p.m., eastern time on 1/2/2014; Plaintif f shall FILE its Reply to Defendant's and Intervenor-Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File its First Amended Complaint by 5:00 p.m., eastern time on 1/6/2014; Plaintiff shall FILE its Reply to Defendant's and Intervenor-Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Motion Seeking an Order for Defendant to Include All Relevant Decision Documents in the Administrative Record by 5:00 p.m., eastern time on 1/6/2014. The briefing schedule and filing requirements set forth in the court's order of November 22, 2013 remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
January 6, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 28 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
April 8, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED OPINION. Redacted version of the opinion issued under seal on 3/14/2014.. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
November 22, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER: Dawnland, LLC Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. Administrative Record due by 12/9/2013. Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on AR due by 1/6/2014; Defendant/Intervenor-Defendant Cross Motions due by 1/24/2014; Plaintiff's Response/Reply due by 2/3/2014; Devendant/Intervenor-Defendant Replies due by 2/12/2014. Oral Argument set for 2/14/2014 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Lynn J. Bush. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
November 22, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: JORDAN POND COMPANY, LLC v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: DAWNLAND, LLC
Represented By: Neil Hall O'Donnell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Barbara E. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORDAN POND COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Richard Garden(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]