MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA, INC. et al v. USA
Plaintiff: |
MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF FLORIDA, INC., MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF MICHIGAN, INC., MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF NEW MEXICO, INC., MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF OHIO, INC., MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS, INC., MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF UTAH, INC., MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF WASHINGTON, INC. and MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF WISCONSIN, INC. |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00097 |
Filed: |
January 23, 2017 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas C. Wheeler |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 4, 2017 |
Filing
25
REPORTED OPINION: Granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 13 Cross Motion to Dismiss. Joint Status Report due by 8/25/2017.. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ad) Copy to parties.
|
March 24, 2017 |
Filing
10
REPORTED OPINION: The Government's Response to Plaintiffs' motion is due by 4/28/2017. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ad) Copy to parties.
|
Search for this case: MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA, INC. et al v. USA |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA, INC. |
Represented By: |
Lawrence S. Sher |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF FLORIDA, INC. |
Represented By: |
Lawrence S. Sher |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF MICHIGAN, INC. |
Represented By: |
Lawrence S. Sher |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF NEW MEXICO, INC. |
Represented By: |
Lawrence S. Sher |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF OHIO, INC. |
Represented By: |
Lawrence S. Sher |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS, INC. |
Represented By: |
Lawrence S. Sher |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF UTAH, INC. |
Represented By: |
Lawrence S. Sher |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF WASHINGTON, INC. |
Represented By: |
Lawrence S. Sher |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF WISCONSIN, INC. |
Represented By: |
Lawrence S. Sher |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: USA |
Represented By: |
Charles Edward Canter |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?