Weis-Buy Farms, Inc. v. Blue Dolphin Produce, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Weis-Buy Farms, Inc.
Defendant: Blue Dolphin Produce, LLC, Gary Milton Norris and Omah Leah Norris
Case Number: 2:2008cv00613
Filed: August 1, 2008
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Economic Stabilization Act Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Douglas N. Frazier
Presiding Judge: John E. Steele
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 07:0499 Agricultural Commodities Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Writ of Garnishment. The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to issue the Writ of Garnishment (Doc. # 22-1) upon the Garnishee TIB Bank, 240 Nokomis Avenue South, Venice, Florida 34285-2314. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/12/2010. (LMH)
August 25, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 the Motion to Dismiss Writ of Garnishment. 1. The Writ of Garnishment in the above-styled cause is hereby dismissed. 2. The Plaintiff shall pay the statutory fee of $100.00 to Victor H. Veschio Law Group, 3105 West Waters Avenue, Suite 204, Tampa, FL 33614. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/25/2010. (LMH)
September 30, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 36 The Plaintiff Weis-Buy Farms Motion for Reconsideration and Reply to Claim for Exemption of Omah Leah Norris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/30/2010. (LMH)
October 27, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Claim of Exemption and Dissolving Writ of Garnishment. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/27/2010. (LMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weis-Buy Farms, Inc. v. Blue Dolphin Produce, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weis-Buy Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. McIntyre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Dolphin Produce, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Milton Norris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omah Leah Norris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]