Scibilia v. Gourley & Gourley, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Maudie Cox Scibilia
Defendant: Gourley & Gourley, LLC and D. Trent Gourley
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv00658
Filed: October 2, 2009
 
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Collier
Referring Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: John E. Steele
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 6 the Defendant, D. Trent Gourley's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction ; granting 22 the Plaintiff Maudie Cox Scibilia's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. The Clerk of the Court shall file the Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit Number 2 to the instant Motion with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/19/2010. (LMH)
May 21, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 the Joint Motion to Allow Parties to Confer Telephonically for Joint Case Management Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/21/2010. (LMH)
October 1, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 49 The Plaintiff Maudie Cox Scibilia's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 51 The Defendant D. Trent Gourleys Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction ; granting 60 The Plaintiff Maudie Co x Scibilias Unoposed Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to accept and file the Third Amended Complaint attached to the instant Motion as Exhibit 1. The Defendant has up to and including Friday, October 22, 2010, to file the Response to the Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/1/2010. (LMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Scibilia v. Gourley & Gourley, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maudie Cox Scibilia
Represented By: Brian Doherty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gourley & Gourley, LLC
Represented By: Eric Chase Roberson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Trent Gourley
Represented By: Eric Chase Roberson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]