BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Anderson et al

Defendant: Unknown Tenants and Robert M. Anderson
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00631
Filed: November 21, 2012
 
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: John E. Steele
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2014 45 Featured Case ORDER dismissing 28 Second Amended Complaint for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction without prejudice to filing a Third Amended Complaint within 7 days; denying as moot 37 Motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/11/2014. (RKR)
April 23, 2014 59 Featured Case ORDER granting 58 Plaintiff's Motion for Default by the Clerk Against Defendant Margaret Veneigh. The Clerk is directed to enter Clerk's Default against Defendant Margaret Veneigh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 4/23/2014. (BLW)
May 19, 2014 64 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting 56 Stipulation for entry of agreed order; granting 47 Renewed Motion for summary judgment as stated in the Opinion and Order and granting Renewed Motion for default judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of plaintiff and against defendants as provided in the Opinion and Order, terminate all deadlines, and close the file. Any motion for attorney's fees and costs shall be filed within 14 days of the entry of judgment. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/19/2014. (RKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Anderson et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tenants
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: Lauren G. Raines
Represented By: Philip V. Martino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]