PNC Bank National Association v. Orchid Group Investments, L.L.C. et al

Defendant: John P. Arnold , Jr., Orchid Group Investments, L.L.C., Lynne W. Washburn, Kristen Flaharty and Patrick Flaharty
Plaintiff: PNC Bank National Association
Case Number: 2:2013cv00012
Filed: January 8, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2014 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 93 Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. a. Plaintiff is awarded damages against Defendants, jointly and severally, in the form of unpaid principal and interest under the 2011 Promissor y Note and the 2011 Commercial Guaranties in the amount of $5,010,266.51 together with prejudgment interest in the amount of $1,865.39 per day from June 11, 2014 through the date of final judgment as well as expenses, court costs, and attor neys' fees to be determined post-judgment. b. Plaintiff shall file a proposed order on entry of final judgment of foreclosure in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants on or before August 8, 2014. An order to conduct a foreclosure sale of t he real property encumbered by the mortgage, generally referenced as twenty (20) acres in Cape Coral, Florida located on the Northeast corner of Pine Island Road and Corbett Road, is appropriate. Thus, the parties shall file a motion for appointment of master to conduct foreclosure sale on or before August 15, 2014. The Clerk of the Court shall maintain the three (3) promissory notes Plaintiff surrendered to the Court on or about July 25, 2014, with the finance records pending cancellation. De fendants Kristen Flaharty and Patrick Flaharty's Motion to Strike Kurt Knaus Affidavit 102 is DENIED. Plaintiff's Unopposed Renewed Motion for Separate Trial on Defendants Kristen Flaharty and Patrick Flaherty's Crossclaim 96 is D ENIED as moot. Given the parties' statements at the final pretrial conference held before the undersigned on August 1, 2014, the parties shall advise the Court as to the status of Defendants Kristen Flaharty and Patrick Flaherty's cross-cla ims against Defendants Lynne Washburn and John Arnold, Jr. within thirty (30) days from the entry of final judgment. Defendants Kristen Flaharty and Patrick Flaharty's Motion in Limine 110 is DENIED as moot.. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/6/2014. (LMF)
August 14, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL Judgment of foreclosure. SEE JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/14/2014. (LMF)
August 14, 2014 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 122 Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association's Unopposed Motion for Appointment of Master to Conduct Foreclosure Sale. a. Philip J. von Kahle of Michael Moecker & Associates, 3613 North 29th Ave., Hollywood, Florida 33020, is appointed as master (the "Master") to conduct the foreclosure sale in accordance with the Final Judgment of Foreclosure on a date and time to be determined by the Master not less than ninety (90) days from the date of the judgment. b. Upo n receiving the bid amount from the purchaser of the property, the Master shall deposit any proceeds of the sale with the Clerk of this Court and shall file a report of sale with the Court, stating the date of the sale, the name and address of the wi nning bidder, the amount of the bid, the proceeds, if any, deposited with the Clerk, and the Master's fees and costs, which sale is subject to confirmation by the Court.c. Upon confirmation of the sale by the Court, the Master shall be authorize d to convey to the purchaser a Certificate of Title or Deed, which shall be recorded in the public records of Lee County, Florida. d. Unless otherwise ordered, upon confirmation of the sale by the Court, and conveyance to the purchaser of the Certif icate of Title or Deed, the Master shall be discharged without further order of the Court. The Master may apply to the Court for further instructions if needed. (2) The Clerk shall add Philip J. von Kahle to the docket as a Special Master (sm:pty) to receive copies of future filings and Orders, and send a copy of this Order and the Final Judgment of Foreclosure to the Special Master. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/14/2014. (LMF)
October 2, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 126 Motion for Taxation of Costs. Defendants' are taxed costs and expenses totaling $3,089.15. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/2/2014. (LMF)
March 8, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default Against Defendant Orchid Group Investments, L.L.C. The Clerk is directed to enter Clerk's default against Defendant Orchid Group Investments, L.L.C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/8/2013. (LMF)
June 12, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing 1 the Complaint without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint on or before July 2, 2013. Failure to file an Amended Complaint within the specified time will result in dismissal of the entire matter for lack of subject matter jurisdiction without further notice, denying as moot 33 Report and Recommendations, the Clerk's Default 22 issued on March 11, 2013, is hereby set aside, denying 30 the Motion for Default Judgment is against Orchid Group Investments, LLC. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate all pending motions and cancel any scheduled deadlines. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/12/2013. (LMF)
September 25, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Plaintiff, PNC Bank, National Association's Motion for Status Conference. The Court will set a Status Conference hearing for Monday, September 30, 2013, at 10:00 AM in Fort Myers Courtroom 5 D before the undersigned. If any Party wishes to appear by telephone, they must contact Leslie Friedmann at (239) 461-2068 for instructions. The September 30, 2013 mediation deadline is VACATED. All other scheduling deadlines remain. (See Doc. #49). The Parties are directed to prese nt their availability for mediation along with their preferred mediator's availability to opposing counsel(s) no later than Friday, September 27, 201 to ensure that the dates can be discussed at the conference. The Clerk is directed to issue a notice of hearing. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/25/2013. (LMF)
September 30, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re status conference. The mediation deadline shall be extended to NOVEMBER 11, 2013. The mediation conference shall be held with Robert Doyle, mediator, at Hahn, Loeser, Parks, LLC, located at 2352 E First Street, Fort Myers, FL. The parties shall advise the Court of the outcome of the mediation pursuant to the dictates of Local Rule 9.06. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/30/2013. (LMF)
November 19, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Parties shall advise the Court no later than November 26, 2013, as to the status of the mediation. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/19/2013. (LMF)
February 13, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Defendants Patrick Flaharty and Kristen Flaharty's Motion to Compel and Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline. a. The request to reopen discovery is GRANTED. Discovery of this matter is reopened f or the limited purpose of allowing the parties to resolve the discovery disputes between the parties regarding the Flaharty Defendants' First Request for Production of Documents and Interrogatories and for the deposition of Kurt Knaus. Plaintif f shall make Mr. Knaus available for deposition on or before March 14, 2014. b. The request to compel Plaintiff to provide better discovery responses is DENIED at this time. (2)The parties are required to meet and confer regarding the Flaharty Defen dants' First Request for Production of Documents and Interrogatories prior to the final pretrial conference to be held before the undersigned on February 21, 2014. The Court will address any unresolved issues at that time. However, the parties shall advise the Court as to the unresolved issues no later than February 19, 2013. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/13/2014. (LMF)
February 13, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Plaintiff PNC Bank's Motion for Final Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice 73 Flaharty Defendants' Motion to Strike the "Second Knaus Affidavit". Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/13/2014. (LMF)
February 18, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER defers consideration 71 of Plaintiff, PNC Bank's Unopposed Motion for Separate Trial on Defendants, Kristen Flaharty and Patrick Flaharty's Crossclaim. Defendants Washburn and Arnold are directed to inform the Court as to their position regarding the instant Motion by noon on Thursday, February 20, 2014. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/18/2014. (LMF)
February 21, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER amending Case Management and Scheduling Order.The Clerk is directed to amend the deadlines on the docket accordingly. Plaintiff, PNC Bank's Unopposed Motion to Separate Trial on Defendants, Kirsten Flaharty and Patrick Flaharty's Cro ssclaim (Doc. #71) is DENIED without prejudice to be refiled if appropriate after discovery closes and closer to the trial date. Plaintiff, PNC Bank, National Association's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying PNC's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #81) is DENIED as the Court is allowing additional discovery and the refiling of summary judgment motions. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/21/2014. (LMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank National Association v. Orchid Group Investments, L.L.C. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Arnold , Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orchid Group Investments, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne W. Washburn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Flaharty
Represented By: Justin B. Mazzara
Represented By: Theodore Lawton Tripp, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Flaharty
Represented By: Justin B. Mazzara
Represented By: Theodore Lawton Tripp, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank National Association
Represented By: Carrie Ann Wozniak
Represented By: Enid Ginnette Childs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]