Hill v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Nancy Jayne Hill
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00120
Filed: February 22, 2013
 
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Charlotte
Referring Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER granting 22 Motion for Entry of Judgment with Remand. The Decision of the Commissioner is hereby reversed and the case is remanded under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) to the Commissioner of Social Security:On remand, the Commissi oner will remand the case to the Administrative Law Judge (ALJ) to give the claimant an opportunity for a new hearing, further develop the record, and issue a new decision. Specifically, the ALJ will further evaluate the claimant's mental impair ments, obtain additional medical evidence as warranted, further evaluate the claimant's residual functional capacity, give further consideration to the claimant's treating and non-treating physician, and evaluate whether the claimant can perform jobs that exist in the national economy while obtaining vocational expert testimony as necessary.The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and CLOSE the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/14/2013. (LMF)
February 25, 2014 27 Featured Case ORDER that the 26 Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED and is made a part of this Order for all purposes. Plaintiff's 25 Petition for Attorney's Fees is GRANTED. Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees in the amount of $5,180.45 and costs in the amount of $385.00 which may be paid directly to counsel if the United States Department of Treasury determines that no federal debt is owed. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/25/2014. (DH)
May 19, 2014 28 Featured Case ORDER re 27 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesOrder on Report and Recommendations. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment pursuant to the Court's May 9, 2014 Order 27 and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/19/2014. (LMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hill v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Jayne Hill
Represented By: Marjorie Anne Schmoyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]