Landmark Financial Solutions, LLC v. Sanchez et al

Plaintiff: Landmark Financial Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Alexandra Sanchez, Gregorio Sanchez, Arrow Financial Services LLC and SunTrust Bank
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00214
Filed: March 15, 2013
 
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default. The Clerk is directed to enter default against Defendant Alexandra Sanchez, Defendant Gregorio Sanchez, Defendant Arrow Financial Services, LLC, and Defendant SunTrust Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 2/26/2014. (ALB)
September 8, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter Judgment in favor of the Plaintiff, Landmark Financial Solutions, LLC and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/8/2014. (LMF)
October 9, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Plaintiff, Landmark Financial Solutions, LLC's Motion to Confirm Foreclosure Sale. (1) Per Count I of the Complaint, as provided by the Decree, per Fed. R. Civ. P. 70, the Court enters this order, confirming the foreclosure sale of the Mortgage against the Property, conveying title to the Property to Florida Holdings 2204636, LLC, which shall be filed and recorded in the local land registry office, with the same legal effect as a Certificate of Title per Fla. Sta. Ann. § 45.11 et seq. (2) Per Count II of the Complaint, as provided by the Decree, Plaintiff, its successors and assigns, are also entitled to possession of the Property, per an ancillary writ of possession. Redding v. Stockton, Whatley, Davin & Co. , 488 So. 2d 548 (Fla. 5th DCA 1986). (3) This order also constitutes a Writ of Possession, placing Florida Holdings 2204636, LLC in exclusive possession of the Property, enforceable by the U.S. Marshall and/or state law enforcement officers. (4) Th e Defendants, occupants of the Property, and all others shall vacate the Property at the direction of the U.S. Marshall and/or local law enforcement officers and shall not commit waste, damage or vandalism against the Property or do anything to impai r its value. Violations of these conditions may be punishable by contempt of court, as provided by the Decree. (5) The Decree of Foreclosure and Order of Sale otherwise remains in effect. The Court declines to retain jurisdiction over the enforcement of all orders entered in the case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/9/2014. (LMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Landmark Financial Solutions, LLC v. Sanchez et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark Financial Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Paul Gerard Wersant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra Sanchez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregorio Sanchez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow Financial Services LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]