Binder v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Julie Binder
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00291
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing case. Plaintiff's Complaint 1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have up to and including December 13, 2013 to file an amended complaint that properly alleges this Court's subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions as moot. The motions may be refiled once Plaintiff has established subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/27/2013. (LMF)
February 20, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing case re 39 Stipulation of Dismissal. This cause is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case, terminate any pending motions and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/20/2014. (LMF)
May 20, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 40 Order dismissing case. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/20/2014. (LMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Binder v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Binder
Represented By: William S. Coffman, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]