Breaking Glass Pictures, LLC v. Doe 10

Plaintiff: Breaking Glass Pictures, LLC
Defendant: Doe 10
Case Number: 2:2013cv00331
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Douglas N. Frazier
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 19 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant to Participate in the Case Management Conference, Motion for Leave to Hold Management Conference via Telephone, and Motion for Extension of Time to File the Case Management Report. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Defendant. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/29/2014. (LMF)
August 11, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 24 Plaintiff Breaking Glass Pictures, LLC's Motion for Sanctions against Defendant for His Failure to Comply with the Court's Orders. Defendant Alexis Devora is again warned he needs to participate in thi s case, follow the proper legal rules, and comply with Court orders. Failure to do so could result in the imposition of sanctions. Sanctions may include but are not limited to an award of reasonable attorney's fees and costs, the striking of pleadings, the entry of default, the dismissal of the case, and a finding of contempt of court. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Defendant.. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/11/2014. (LMF)
December 4, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. No later than December 19, 2014, the parties are directed to (1) have Mediator James "Jim" Nulman file a mediation report in this case; (2) jointly file a notice regarding the outcome of their mediation efforts; or (3) show cause, i ndividually or jointly, as to why mediation has not been completed by the Court's deadline. Failure to comply with this Order may result in sanctions. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Defendant. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/4/2014. (LMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breaking Glass Pictures, LLC v. Doe 10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breaking Glass Pictures, LLC
Represented By: Richard E. Fee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]