Gibbs v. United States of America et al

Defendant: Does 1-100 and United States of America
Plaintiff: M. Eugene Gibbs
Case Number: 3:2011cv00075
Filed: January 25, 2011
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Jacksonville Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Thomas E. Morris
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 9 Motion for preliminary injunction; see Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 2/25/2011. (JAL)
March 4, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding some responsibilities and obligations of pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E. Morris on 3/4/2011. (DLC)
February 7, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 1 Complaint; directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint by 2/28/11; denying without prejudice 2 Motion for preliminary injunction; see Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 2/4/2011. (JAL)
August 15, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Motion to vacate, and overruling Plaintiff's objections to 61 Magistrate Judge's Order. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/15/2011. (JAL)
September 28, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Motion to sever. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E. Morris on 9/28/2011. (DLC)
September 28, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 72 Motion for entry of default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E. Morris on 9/28/2011. (DLC)
March 31, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling 92 objections set forth in Plaintiff's Reply to Report and Recommendation; adopting in part 89 Report and Recommendation; granting 27 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; denying [ 65] Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint; denying 81 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 3/31/2012. (JW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs v. United States of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Collette Bridget Cunningham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Eugene Gibbs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]