James D. Hinson Electrical Contracting Co., Inc. et al v. AT&T Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
James D. Hinson Electrical Contracting Co., Inc., Blythe Development Company, Callaway Grading, Inc. and National Utility Contractors Association |
Defendant: |
AT&T Services, Inc. and Bellsouth Telecommunications, LLC. |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00029 |
Filed: |
January 10, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Florida |
Office: |
Jacksonville Office |
County: |
Duval |
Presiding Judge: |
Timothy J. Corrigan |
Presiding Judge: |
James R. Klindt |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Property: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 16, 2016 |
Filing
172
FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT granting 164 class counsel's fee application and request for approval of service awards; granting 165 joint motion for final approval of their proposed class action settlement. See Order for details. The Clerk should close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 12/16/2016. (SEJ)
|
March 20, 2014 |
Filing
52
ORDER granting 13 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint on or before 4/18/2014. Defendants shall file their answers to the amended complaint on or before 5/18/2014. The Clerk should enter a notice designating this case a Track Three case under Local Rule 3.05. The stay of discovery is lifted. The Court will enter a separate case management and scheduling order. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 3/20/2014. (BJB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: James D. Hinson Electrical Contracting Co., Inc. et al v. AT&T Services, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: James D. Hinson Electrical Contracting Co., Inc. |
Represented By: |
Kenneth S. Canfield |
Represented By: |
David Hagy |
Represented By: |
John Sam Kalil |
Represented By: |
Gary V. Mauney |
Represented By: |
James A. Roberts, III |
Represented By: |
E. Lanny Russell |
Represented By: |
Robert E. Shields |
Represented By: |
Charles W. Surasky |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Blythe Development Company |
Represented By: |
Kenneth S. Canfield |
Represented By: |
David Hagy |
Represented By: |
John Sam Kalil |
Represented By: |
Gary V. Mauney |
Represented By: |
James A. Roberts, III |
Represented By: |
E. Lanny Russell |
Represented By: |
Robert E. Shields |
Represented By: |
Charles W. Surasky |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Callaway Grading, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Kenneth S. Canfield |
Represented By: |
David Hagy |
Represented By: |
John Sam Kalil |
Represented By: |
Gary V. Mauney |
Represented By: |
James A. Roberts, III |
Represented By: |
E. Lanny Russell |
Represented By: |
Robert E. Shields |
Represented By: |
Charles W. Surasky |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: National Utility Contractors Association |
Represented By: |
Kenneth S. Canfield |
Represented By: |
David Hagy |
Represented By: |
John Sam Kalil |
Represented By: |
Gary V. Mauney |
Represented By: |
James A. Roberts, III |
Represented By: |
E. Lanny Russell |
Represented By: |
Robert E. Shields |
Represented By: |
Charles W. Surasky |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Albert L. Frevola, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Bellsouth Telecommunications, LLC. |
Represented By: |
Albert L. Frevola, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?