Hancock Bank v. Bright Lake Estates, L.L.C. et al

Defendant: Randall B. Langley, Matthew A. Seibel, Knight Engineering Consultants, Inc., Clearwater Reserve Home Owners Association Inc. and Bright Lake Estates, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Hancock Bank
Case Number: 5:2012cv00649
Filed: November 27, 2012
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ocala Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Wm. Terrell Hodges
Referring Judge: Philip R. Lammens
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ruling deferred 13 Plaintiff Hancock Bank's Motion to Strike Defendant Bright Lake Estates, LLC's Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 2/15/2013. (AR)
March 8, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Plaintiff Hancock Bank's Motion to Strike Defendant Bright Lake Estates, LLC's Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/8/2013. (AR)
April 15, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Plaintiff Hancock Bank's Motion to Strike Defendants Randall B. Langley's and Matthew A. Seibel's Jury Trial Demand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/15/2013. (AR)
April 18, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion for referral to mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/18/2013. (AR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock Bank v. Bright Lake Estates, L.L.C. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall B. Langley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew A. Seibel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Engineering Consultants, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearwater Reserve Home Owners Association Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bright Lake Estates, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hancock Bank
Represented By: Robert J. Stovash
Represented By: Dana Ann Snyderman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]