Abdennour v. Summer Bay Sales & Marketing, L.C.

Defendant: Summer Bay Sales & Marketing, L.C.
Plaintiff: Mohamed Abdennour
Case Number: 5:2013cv00312
Filed: July 1, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ocala Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Anne C. Conway
Referring Judge: Philip R. Lammens
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, within 14 days of this Order, the parties are directed to supplement their Joint Motion to Approve Settlement (Doc. 18) with an executed copy of the settlement agreement (including the settlement amount, and amount of attorneys' fees), and any additional information that the Court would require in order to make a determination regarding whether the settlement is fair and reasonable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 12/30/2013. (JWM)
January 15, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 18 Joint MOTION for approval of settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/15/2014. (JWM)
January 23, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION granting 18 Joint MOTION for Approval of Settlement and Dismissal with Prejudice. The Court finds the settlement is a fair and reasonable resolution of a bona fide dispute over FLSA issues. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE the file Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/23/2014. (SR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdennour v. Summer Bay Sales & Marketing, L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer Bay Sales & Marketing, L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Abdennour
Represented By: N. Ryan LaBar
Represented By: Scott C. Adams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]