Bray & Gillespie Management LLC et al v. Lexington Insurance Company
Plaintiff: |
Bray & Gillespie X, LLC, Bray & Gillespie Management LLC, Bray & Gillespie Delaware I, L.P., Bray & Gillespie Plaza, LLC, Bray & Gillespie V, LLC, Bray & Gillespie VIII, LLC and Bray & Gillespie Laplaya, LLC |
Defendant: |
Lexington Insurance Company, Belfor USA Group, Inc., Building Consulting Associates, Inc. and Vericlaim, Inc. |
Case Number: |
6:2007cv00222 |
Filed: |
February 13, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Florida |
Office: |
Orlando Office |
County: |
Volusia |
Presiding Judge: |
Patricia C. Fawsett |
Presiding Judge: |
Karla R. Spaulding |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 5, 2010 |
Filing
644
ORDER ADOPTING, CONFIRMING, and APPROVING in part 576 578 Magistrate Judge's Reports and Recommendations; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 526 Defendant's Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff shall have 14 days from the date of this Or der to pay to Defendant the amount of $75,000.00. Further, Plaintiff shall have up to and including January 23, 2009, to produce all remaining Treasure Island room folios or other related Treasure Island guest files not yet produced to Defendant during the course of this litigation. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/5/2010. (JDM)
|
August 3, 2009 |
Filing
578
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 526 MOTION for sanctions (Rule 37) filed by Lexington Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 8/3/2009. (DAH)
|
April 17, 2009 |
Filing
512
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 478 Motion to strike ; granting in part and denying in part 486 Motion to strike ; granting in part and denying in part 511 Motion to supplement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 4/17/2009. (DAH)
|
March 4, 2009 |
Filing
460
ORDER granting in part 202 Motion for sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 3/4/2009. (DAH)
|
February 17, 2009 |
Filing
451
ORDER re 450 MOTION to compel Bray & Gillespie Management, LLC's Production of Documents and Further Amendment of Plaintiffs' Amended Privilege Log filed by Lexington Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 2/17/2009. (DAH)
|
January 8, 2009 |
Filing
444
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 328 Motion for protective order; adopting in part 395 Report and Recommendations.; adopting in part 425 Report and Recommendations.; denying 430 Motion to review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/8/2009. (DAH)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Bray & Gillespie Management LLC et al v. Lexington Insurance Company |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Bray & Gillespie X, LLC |
Represented By: |
William H. Pillsbury |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Bray & Gillespie Management LLC |
Represented By: |
John N. Ellison |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Bray & Gillespie Delaware I, L.P. |
Represented By: |
William H. Pillsbury |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Bray & Gillespie Plaza, LLC |
Represented By: |
William H. Pillsbury |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Bray & Gillespie V, LLC |
Represented By: |
William H. Pillsbury |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Bray & Gillespie VIII, LLC |
Represented By: |
William H. Pillsbury |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Bray & Gillespie Laplaya, LLC |
Represented By: |
William H. Pillsbury |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company |
Represented By: |
Daniel Cramer Brown |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Belfor USA Group, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Marvin P. Pastel, II |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Building Consulting Associates, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Steven M. Thompson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Vericlaim, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Carl D. Motes |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?