Satterfield v. CFI Sales & Marketing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Raymond Satterfield |
Defendant: |
CFI Sales & Marketing, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc. and Westgate Resorts, Inc. |
Case Number: |
6:2009cv01827 |
Filed: |
October 28, 2009 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida |
Office: |
Orlando Office |
County: |
Orange |
Presiding Judge: |
John Antoon II |
Presiding Judge: |
David A. Baker |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 6, 2013 |
Filing
247
ORDER adopting 235 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; granting in part 216 and 218 MOTION for attorney fees and costs; awarding Plaintiffs attorneys' fees of $139,560.00 and costs of $16,767.12 for a total of $156,327.12. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 6/5/2013. (BRS)
|
May 10, 2012 |
Filing
210
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 207 Report and Recommendations. The settlement agreement reached at the settlement conference on March 9, 2012 is APPROVED. This case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this file. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file their claim for fees within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/10/2012. (DJD)
|
February 28, 2012 |
Filing
196
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 155 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 2/28/2012. (EK)
|
November 15, 2011 |
Filing
170
ORDER Granting 164 Motion to Approve Settlement Involving Graciela Everest, Andrew Sugrim, Johana Cardile, and Jorge Pereira; Adopting Report and Recommendations re 166 Report and Recommendations. The claims between Plaintiffs Graciela Everest, Andrew Sugrim, Johana Cardile, and Jorge Pereira and Defendants only are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 11/15/2011. (DJD)
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing
139
ORDER Granting 133 Motion to Approve Settlement; Adopting Report and Recommendations re 136 Report and Recommendations. The claims between Plaintiff Vincente Orellano and Defendants CFI Sales & Marketing, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc., and Westgate Resorts, Inc. only are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 7/26/2011. (DJD)
|
June 16, 2011 |
Filing
134
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 132 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs Asonta Baker, Carolina Forero, Daniel Forero, Veronica Maurovich, Dennis Pranouskes, and James Usher are awarded $9,095.05 in attorneys fees and $904.95 in costs. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 6/16/2011. (DJD)
|
May 24, 2011 |
Filing
131
ORDER adopting 118 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; granting in part and denying in part 90 MOTION for sanctions against Certain Named Plaintiffs; denying the Motion as to Plaintiffs Pereira and Sugrim; granting the Motion as to Plaintiff Roberto Santana; dismissing the claims of Plaintiff Roberto Santana. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/24/2011. (BRS)
|
May 3, 2011 |
Filing
117
ORDER Granting 108 Motion to Approve Settlement; Adopting Report and Recommendations re 112 Report and Recommendations. The settlements of these Plaintiffs for unpaid wages and liquidated damages are accepted as fair and reasonable resolutions of bona fide disputes under the Fair Labor Standard Act. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 5/3/2011. (DJD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?