Santiago v. Evans et al

Plaintiff: Benito Santiago
Defendant: George M. Evans and Bennybeth & J Jr's Express
 
Case Number: 6:2012cv00577
Filed: April 16, 2012
 
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Orlando Office
County: Broward
Referring Judge: David A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Anne C. Conway
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2013 131 Featured Case ORDER adopting 127 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. 109 MOTION for attorney fees is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/6/2013. (LAK)
August 6, 2012 60 Featured Case ORDER adopting 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION denying 26 MOTION to Dismiss Action and Vacate Arrest. Claimants' Objections (Doc. No. 46 ) are DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 8/3/2012. (SR)
November 27, 2012 97 Featured Case ORDER: The Court concludes that Santiago is the rightful owner of the Vessel. By November 30, 2012, the parties shall file any motions for attorney's fees, if applicable. By November 30, 2012, Santiago shall file any motion necessary to complete the transfer of the Vessel back to Santiago. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 11/27/2012. (SR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Santiago v. Evans et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benito Santiago
Represented By: Jose D. Sosa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George M. Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennybeth & J Jr's Express
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]