Bain et al v. McIntosh et al

Defendant: Stenstrom McIntosh, Et Al, P.A., Steven Kane, Robert McIntosh and Kane & Koltun
Plaintiff: Dorothy B. Walther and Howard Walther
 
Case Number: 6:2013cv00472
Filed: March 22, 2013
 
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Orlando Office
County: Orange
Referring Judge: Gregory J. Kelly
Presiding Judge: Roy B. Dalton
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332fd Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2014 103 Featured Case ORDER denying 99 motion to stay. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/22/2014. (VMF)
August 7, 2013 55 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 Motion for summary judgment; granting 19 Motion for Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/6/2013. (VMF)
October 5, 2013 82 Featured Case ORDER granting 52 Motion for Sanctions; granting 76 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/4/2013. (VMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bain et al v. McIntosh et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stenstrom McIntosh, Et Al, P.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Kane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert McIntosh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kane & Koltun
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy B. Walther
Represented By: John V. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Walther
Represented By: John V. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]