Parker v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Catriona Dora Parker
 
Case Number: 6:2013cv00521
Filed: April 1, 2013
 
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Orlando Office
County: Volusia
Presiding Judge: Anne C. Conway
Referring Judge: Gregory J. Kelly
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS amending the report and recommendation at Docket Entry No. 19. If the parties have no objection to this report and recommendation, they may promptly file a joint notice of no objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul A. Zoss on 1/10/2014. (PAB)
January 15, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting and confirming 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The final decision of the Commissioner is hereby REVERSED and the matter REMANDED for further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of the Claimant and against the Commissioner. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE the file. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/15/2014. (SR)
March 6, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Plaintiff's Uncontested Petition for Attorney's Fees is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Motion is Granted only to the extent that the Court awards EAJAfees to Plaintiff in the amount of $350.00 for costs and $3,208.65 for attorney fees. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 3/6/2014. (LAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Parker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catriona Dora Parker
Represented By: Richard A. Culbertson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]