Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. v. The Unidentified Shipwrecked Vessel Featured Case

Admiralty in rem action over a shipwrecked vessel lying at a depth of 1100 meters, beyond the territorial waters or contiguous zone of any sovereign nation, and 100 miles west of the Straits of Gibralter.

Claimant: Kingdom of Spain
Plaintiff: Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.
Defendant: The Unidentified Shipwrecked Vessel
 
Case Number: 8:2007cv00614
Filed: April 9, 2007
 
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Mark A. Pizzo
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2010 ACKNOWLEDGMENT by USCA of receiving the record on appeal on 7/26/10 re 280 Notice of appeal, 272 Notice of appeal, 278 Notice of appeal, 274 Notice of appeal, 275 Notice of appeal, 277 Notice of appeal, 276 Notice of appeal, 279 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 10-10269-JJ, 10-10317-JJ, 10-10318-JJ, 10-10319-JJ, 10-10320-JJ, 10-10374-JJ, and 10-10375-JJ. (DG)
July 30, 2010 ACKNOWLEDGMENT by USCA of receiving the certificate of readiness on 7/26/10 re 280 Notice of appeal, 272 Notice of appeal, 278 Notice of appeal, 274 Notice of appeal, 275 Notice of appeal, 277 Notice of appeal, 276 Notice of appeal, 279 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 10-10317-JJ, 10-10318-JJ, 10-10319-JJ, 10-10320-JJ, 10-10374-JJ, and 10-10375-JJ. (DG)
July 22, 2010 RECORD on appeal sent to USCA re 280 Notice of appeal, 272 Notice of appeal, 278 Notice of appeal, 274 Notice of appeal, 275 Notice of appeal, 277 Notice of appeal, 276 Notice of appeal, 279 Notice of appeal. Transmittal includes certified copy of docket sheet, volume of pleadings: 3 [2 public; 1 sealed], volume of transcripts: 2, and 7 expandable folders of documentary exhibits. USCA number 10-10269-JJ, 10-10317-JJ, 10-10318-JJ, 10-10319-JJ, 10-10320-JJ, 10-10374-JJ, 10-10375-JJ (DG)
June 15, 2010 284 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 277 Notice of appeal filed by Alejandro Julian Pera Barthe', Maria Eugenia Solveyra, Ignacio Solveyra, Agustina Solveyra, Emilio de Alvear, Santiago de Alvear, that appellant's motion to reinstate this appeal is granted. Additionally, the motions to adopt the record excerpts filed by Appellant Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc., in USCA case number 10-10269-JJ, which motions to adopt are filed in USCA case numbers 10-10317-JJ, 10-10318-JJ and 10-10374-JJ. EOD: 6/11/10; USCA number: 10-10320-JJ (DG)
May 17, 2010 283 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 277 Notice of appeal filed by Alejandro Julian Pera Barthe', Maria Eugenia Solveyra, Ignacio Solveyra, Agustina Solveyra, Emilio de Alvear, Santiago de Alvear; that, pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-2(c), this appeal is dismissed for want of prosecution because appellants failed to file a brief and record excerpts within the time fixed by the rules. EOD: 5/14/10; Issued as mandate. USCA number: 10-10320-JJ (DG)
March 10, 2010 282 CERTIFICATE of readiness sent to USCA re: 280 Notice of appeal, 274 Notice of appeal, 277 Notice of appeal, 279 Notice of appeal, 272 Notice of appeal, 278 Notice of appeal, 275 Notice of appeal, 276 Notice of appeal. ROA consists of: volume of pleadings: 3 [2 public; 1 sealed]; volume of transcripts: 2; and 7 expandable folders of documentary exhibits. USCA number: 10-10269-J, 10-10317-J, 10-10318-J, 10-10319-J, 10-10320-J, 10-10374-J, 10-10375-J (DG) Modified on 3/10/2010 (DG).
February 10, 2010 281 TRANSCRIPT information form filed by Alejandro Julian Pera Barthe', Agustina Solveyra, Ignacio Solveyra, Maria Eugenia Solveyra, Emilio de Alvear, Santiago de Alvear re 277 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 10-10320-J. (Farmer, Matthew)
February 5, 2010 ACKNOWLEDGMENT by USCA of receiving the last three pages of certified copy of updated docket sheet, reflecting payment of appellate filing fee fees on 1/27/10 re 275 Notice of appeal. (DG)
February 5, 2010 ACKNOWLEDGMENT by USCA of receiving the last three pages of certified copy of updated docket sheet, reflecting payment of appellate filing fees paid on 1/28/10 re 278 Notice of appeal. (DG)
January 29, 2010 ACKNOWLEDGMENT by USCA of receiving initial appeal package on 01/21/10 re 272 Notice of appeal. USCA number: 10-10269-J. (JMS)
January 27, 2010 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding certified copy of last four pages of updated docket sheet, reflecting payment of appellate filing fees received by District Court on 1/26/10, re 274 Notice of appeal. USCA number: not yet known. (DG)
January 26, 2010 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number 053814 re 274 Notice of appeal filed by Julio Vega Eurasquin, Enriqueta Pita Duthurburu, Gonzalo de Aliaga (EV)
January 26, 2010 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding certified copy of last three pages of updated docket sheet reflecting the payment of appellate fee payment received by District Court on 1/25/10 re 278 Notice of appeal. (DG) Modified on 1/26/2010 (DG).
January 25, 2010 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding Amended Notice of Appeal, 269 ORDER, certified copy of last three pages of updated docket sheet re 280 Notice of appeal (JMS)
January 25, 2010 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number 53777 re 278 Notice of appeal filed by Jaime Durand Palacios (RFK)
January 25, 2010 TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding certified copy of last three pages of updated docket sheet, reflecting payment of appeal fee received by 1/22/10 re 275 Notice of appeal. USCA number: not yet known. (DG) Modified on 1/25/2010 (DG).
January 22, 2010 280 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 279 Notice of appeal, 271 Judgment, 270 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, 269 ORDER, by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez. Filing fee $455, receipt number 53758. (JMS) Modified on 1/25/2010 (JMS).
January 22, 2010 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of certified copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re 278 Notice of appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. (JMS)
January 22, 2010 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of certified copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re 279 Notice of appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. Appeal fee paid. (JMS)
January 22, 2010 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number 53760 re 275 Notice of appeal filed by Elsa Dorca Whitlock (RFK)
January 22, 2010 278 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 271 Judgment, 270 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations by Jaime Durand Palacios. (Filing fee not paid) (Burnette, Guy)
January 21, 2010 279 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 271 Judgment, 270 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations by Jose Antonio Rodriguez Menendez. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 53758.(JMS) # 1 Exhibit 79/A, # 2 Exhibit 101/B) (JMS).
January 20, 2010 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of certified copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re 277 Notice of appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General.appeal fee paid (JMS)
January 20, 2010 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of certified copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re 276 Notice of appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. Paid appeal fee. (JMS)
January 20, 2010 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of certified copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re 275 Notice of appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. (JMS)
January 20, 2010 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number 53729 re 276 Notice of appeal filed by Republic of Peru (RFK)
January 20, 2010 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number 53728 re 277 Notice of appeal filed by Alejandro Julian Pera Barthe', Maria Eugenia Solveyra, Ignacio Solveyra, Agustina Solveyra, Emilio de Alvear, Santiago de Alvear (RFK)
January 20, 2010 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of certified copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re 274 Notice of appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. (JMS)
January 20, 2010 277 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 271 Judgment, 270 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations by Alejandro Julian Pera Barthe', Agustina Solveyra, Ignacio Solveyra, Maria Eugenia Solveyra, Emilio de Alvear, Santiago de Alvear. (Filing fee not paid) (McLaughlin, John)
January 19, 2010 276 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 271 Judgment, 270 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations by Republic of Peru. (Filing fee not paid) (Shusta, Timothy)
January 19, 2010 275 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 271 Judgment, 270 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations by Elsa Dorca Whitlock. (Filing fee not paid) (White, Marlow)
January 19, 2010 274 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 271 Judgment, 270 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations by Gonzalo de Aliaga, Enriqueta Pita Duthurburu, Julio Vega Eurasquin. (Filing fee not paid) (Horan, David)
January 19, 2010 273 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 270 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations by Gonzalo de Aliaga. (Filing fee not paid) (Horan, David) NOTE: THIS ITEM IS TO BE REFILED AS THERE IS INCORRECT ITEM LINKED TO APPEAL, PER PHONE CALL WITH COUNSEL'S OFFICE ON 1/19/10. ITEM TO BE REFILED. Modified on 1/19/2010 (DG).
January 19, 2010 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of certified copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re 272 Notice of appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. (DG)
January 15, 2010 USCA appeal fees received $ 455 receipt number 53592 re 272 Notice of appeal filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (RFK)
January 15, 2010 272 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 271 Judgment, 270 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Filing fee not paid) (Nelson, Carl)
December 28, 2009 271 JUDGMENT of dismissal for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is hereby entered as to the amended complaint (Doc. 25) and as to each claim to the res (Docs. 13, 120, 136, 157, 164, 168, 169, 175 and 176). (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (AG)
December 22, 2009 270 Featured Case ORDER adopting 209 --REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; granting 131 --motion to dismiss amended complaint or for summary judgment; dismissing amended complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; dismissing claims to the res for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; granting 132 --motion to vacate 5 --order on motion for miscellaneous relief (arrest warrant); directing the Clerk to: (1) ENTER JUDGMENT of dismissal for lack of subject matter jurisdiction as to the amended complaint (Doc. 25) and as to each claim to the res (Docs. 13, 120, 136, 157, 164, 168, 169, 175, and 176); (2) TERMINATE any pending motion; and (3) CLOSE the case.The substitute custodian, Odyssey, shall return the res to Spain within ten days under the circumstances and in a manner subject to approval by the Magistrate Judge. The order to the substitute custodian to return the res is STAYED, the order vacating the arrest warrant is STAYED, and the status quo of the res shall persist until the earlier of (1) the day after the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals issues a mandate in this case or, (2) if no party appeals, the expiration of the time to notice an appeal. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/22/2009. (BK)
November 23, 2009 269 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 268 Motion to compel. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 11/23/2009. (AGG)
November 20, 2009 268 MOTION to compel Kingdom of Spain and its legal counsel to serve Jose Antonio Rodriguez Menendez with pleadings and exhibits by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 111A, # 2 Exhibit 112A)(AG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
November 19, 2009 267 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Linda Starr (LS)
November 19, 2009 266 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 8 January 2009 before Judge Mark A. Pizzo. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda Starr,Telephone number 8133015252. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 12/10/2009, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2009, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2010. (LS)
November 17, 2009 265 NOTICE of change of address by Gianluca Morello (Morello, Gianluca)
November 9, 2009 264 Featured Case ORDER granting 263 --motion by descendant claimants for leave to respond out of time; response due 11/13/2009. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/9/2009. (BK)
October 19, 2009 263 MOTION for extension of time to file response as to 247 Statement of Interest and Amicus Curiae Brief by Gonzalo de Aliaga, Enriqueta Pita Duthurburu, Julio Vega Eurasquin. (Attachments: # 1Response to US Statement of Interest and Amicus Curiar Brief])(Horan, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. Modified on 10/20/2009 (AG).
October 16, 2009 262 RESPONSE re 247 Statement of Insterest and Brief as Amicus Curiae; 237 Kingdom of Spain's Response re 231 Objection filed by Republic of Peru. (Shusta, Timothy) Modified on 10/19/2009 (AG).
October 15, 2009 261 REPLY to Kingdom of Spain's 236 Response to Odyssey Marine Exploration's and Individual Claimants' 230 Objections to the Magistrate Judge's 209 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, filed by Elsa Dorca Whitlock, Jaime Durand Palacios. (White, Marlow) Modified on 10/16/2009 (AG).
October 15, 2009 260 REPLY to Kingdom of Spain's 236 Response to Odyssey Marine Exploration's 230 Objections to the Magistrate Judge's 209 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (Morello, Gianluca) Modified on 10/16/2009 (AG).
October 14, 2009 259 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 247 Notice (Other)Notice (Other) (opposition to U.S. Statement of Interest and Amicus Curiae Brief) filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Morello, Gianluca)
October 9, 2009 258 Featured Case ORDER denying 255 Motion to file amicus brief. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/9/2009. (TKD)
October 9, 2009 257 SUPPLEMENT to 255 Motion to file amicus brief by Members of Congress. (Stull, R.) Modified on 10/9/2009 (AG).
October 9, 2009 256 RESPONSE in opposition re 255 MOTION to file amicus brief filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
October 8, 2009 255 MOTION to file amicus brief by Members of Congress. (Stull, R.)
October 6, 2009 254 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 253 --motion for leave to file. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/6/2009. (BK)
October 6, 2009 253 OPPOSED MOTION for leave to file motion correcting error and reply to Kingdom of Spain's response to objections by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez. (AG)
October 6, 2009 252 Featured Case ORDER granting 249 --motion for leave to file; Peru may file by 10/16/2009 a fifteen page response; granting 245 --motion for clarification; the "cargo claimants" may file by 10/16/2009 a joint reply; denying as moot 246 --supplemental motion for clarification; denying 248 --motion for leave to file declaration. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/6/2009. (BK)
October 5, 2009 251 RESPONSE in opposition re 248 MOTION for leave to file Declaration in Support of Odyssey's Opposition to U.S. Statement of Interest filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
October 2, 2009 250 REQUEST for oral argument re 247 NOTICE - Statement of interest and brief as Amicus Curiae 231 Objection, 237 Response by Republic of Peru. (Shusta, Timothy) Modified on 10/5/2009 (AG).
October 2, 2009 249 MOTION for leave to file Reply in Support of Objections and Response to U.S. Statement of Interest by Republic of Peru. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Reply and Response)(Shusta, Timothy)
October 1, 2009 248 MOTION for leave to file Declaration in Support of Odyssey's Opposition to U.S. Statement of Interest by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Morello, Gianluca)
September 29, 2009 247 STATEMENT OF INTEREST AND BRIEF AS AMICUS CURIAE in support of The Kingdom of Spain by United States of America; re 244 Order on motion to file amicus brief (Attachments: # 1 certificate of service)(O'Malley, Barbara) Modified on 9/29/2009 (AG).
September 22, 2009 246 Supplemental MOTION for clarification by Elsa Dorca Whitlock. (White, Marlow)
September 22, 2009 245 Joint MOTION for clarification by Jamie Durand Palacios, Elsa Dorca Whitlock. (White, Marlow) Modified on 9/23/2009 (AG).
September 18, 2009 244 Featured Case ORDER directing the clerk to electronically delete docket item numbers 239-2 through 239-10 and granting 239 Motion to submit a statement of interest. On or before October 2, 2009 the United States may submit a statement of interest of no more than ten (10) pages; granting 241 Motion for leave to file reponse to statement of interest; granting 242 Motion for leave to reply in support of the objections to the magistrate judges report and recommendation. On or before October 16, 2009, the plaintiff may submit a reply of no more than ten pages. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/18/2009. (TKD)
September 11, 2009 243 RESPONSE in opposition re 242 MOTION for leave to file reply to Spain's response to Odyssey's and certain claimants' objections to the 6.3.09 Report & Recommendation filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
September 10, 2009 242 MOTION for leave to file reply to Spain's response to Odyssey's and certain claimants' objections to the 6.3.09 Report & Recommendation by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Morello, Gianluca)
September 9, 2009 241 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file response to U.S.'s Statement of Interest & Amicus Curiae Brief (Doc. 239-2) in the event Court grants leave to file that brief by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Morello, Gianluca)
September 9, 2009 240 RESPONSE in opposition re 239 MOTION to file amicus brief filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Morello, Gianluca)
September 9, 2009 239 MOTION to file amicus brief by United States of America. (Attachments: # ALL ATTACHMENTS ARE STRICKEN AND IMAGE REMOVED PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S 244 ORDER (1) Statement of Interest and Brief of the United States as Amicus Curiae in Support of the Kingdom of Spain, # 2 Declaration of Ambassador David A. Balton, # 3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ambassador David A. Balton, # 4 Exhibit B - Declaration of Ambassador David A. Balton, # 5 Exhibit C - Declaration of Ambassador David A. Balton, # 6 Declaration of Vice Admiral James W. Houck, # 7 Exhibit A - Declaration of Vice Admiral James W. Houck, # 8 Declaration of Larry E. Murphy, # 9 Certificate of Service)(O'Malley, Barbara) Modified on 9/21/2009 (AG).
August 31, 2009 238 NOTICE of Errata by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez (RFM)
August 31, 2009 237 RESPONSE re 231 Objection filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
August 31, 2009 236 RESPONSE re 230 Objection, 234 Objection to Report and Recommendations, 231 Objection, 227 Memorandum in opposition, 228 Objection, 229 Objection filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goold, James)
August 27, 2009 235 **(DOCUMENT TERMINATED)** MOTION to file amicus brief by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Interest and Brief of the United States as Amicus Curiae in Support of the Kingdom of Spain, # 2 Declaration of Ambassador David A. Balton, # 3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ambassador David A. Balton, # 4 Exhibit B - Declaration of Ambassador David A. Balton, # 5 Exhibit C - Declaration of Ambassador David A. Balton, # 6 Declaration of Vice Admiral James W. Houck, # 7 Exhibit A - Declaration of Vice Admiral James W. Houck, # 8 Declaration of Larry E. Murphy)(O'Malley, Barbara) Modified on 9/8/2009 - (NO ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE; COUNSEL HAS BEEN CONTACTED AND INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE TO COMPLY WITH ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURES FOR ELECTORNIC FILING) (AG).
July 21, 2009 234 OBJECTION to 209 Report and Recommendations by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez. (Attachment: spiral binder of exhibit (Research Report on the ancestry of Jose Antonio Rodriguez Menendez) - available at the clerk's office in paper format) **Note: additional exhibits received on 07/22/09) (AG) Modified on 7/29/2009 (AG).
July 21, 2009 233 REQUEST for oral argument re 230 Objection by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Morello, Gianluca)
July 21, 2009 232 DECLARATION of Gianluca Morello re 230 Objection by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Part 1 of 5, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Part 2 of 5, # 9 Exhibit 7 - Part 3 of 5, # 10 Exhibit 7 - Part 4 of 5, # 11 Exhibit 7 - Part 5 of 5, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10)(Morello, Gianluca)
July 21, 2009 231 OBJECTION to 209 Report and Recommendations by Republic of Peru. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of John Norton Moore)(Shusta, Timothy) Modified on 7/22/2009 (AG).
July 21, 2009 230 OBJECTION to 209 Report and Recommendations by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (Morello, Gianluca) Modified on 7/22/2009 (AG).
July 21, 2009 229 OBJECTION to 209 Report and Recommendations by Santiago de Alvear, Emilio de Alvear, Maria Eugenia Solveyra, Alejandro Julian Pera Barthe, Agustina Solveyra, Ignacio Solveyra. (McLaughlin, John) Modified on 7/22/2009 (AG).
July 21, 2009 228 OBJECTION to 209 Report and Recommendations by Gonzalo de Aliaga, Agustin de Aliaga, Gonzalo Alvarez del Villar, Ignacio de Colmenares, Alberto Emilio Thiessen, Enriqueta Pita Duthurburu, Flora Leonor Perales Calderon de Colmenares, Felipe Voyest, Adela Armida de Izcue Bazo, Carola Daireaux Kinsky, Eleonora Daireaux Kinsky, Matilde Daireaux Kinsky, Julio Vega Eurasquin, Inez Marquez Osorio, Javier de Goyeneche, Juan Mariano de Goyeneche y Silvela. (Horan, David) Modified on 7/22/2009 (AG).
July 15, 2009 227 OBJECTIONS to 209 Report and Recommendations by Elsa Dorca Whitlock, Jaime Durand Palacios. (White, Marlow) Modified on 7/16/2009 (AG).
July 2, 2009 226 NOTICE of baptism certifications by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez in support of 175 Verified Claim. (AG)
June 30, 2009 225 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 224 --motion to extend time: all parties shall file written objections to the report and recommendation by 7/21/2009; the Kingdom of Spain may file a response to the objections by 8/31/2009. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/30/2009. (BK)
June 30, 2009 224 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to file objections to the June 3, 2009, Report & Recommendation (Doc. 209) by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Morello, Gianluca)
June 19, 2009 223 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 221 --motion to extend to 7/6/2009 the time within which to file objections to report and recommendation and to extend to 8/7/2009 the time within which to reply to objections. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/19/2009. (BK)
June 16, 2009 222 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part without prejudice 190 Motion for continuance. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 6/16/2009. (AGG)
June 15, 2009 221 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Report and Recommendation by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez. (AG)
June 12, 2009 220 NOTICE of baptism and/or marriage certifications by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez in support of 175 Verified Claim.(AG)
June 12, 2009 219 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 214 --motion by claimants Santiago de Alvear, Emilio de Alvear, Maria Eugenia Solveyra, Alejandro Julian Pera Barthe, Agustina Solveyra, and Ignacio Solveyra to extend to 7/6/2009 the time within which to respond to 209 --REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/12/2009. (BK)
June 12, 2009 218 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 217 --motion by claimants Elsa Whitlock and Jaime Palacios to extend to 7/6/2009 the time within which to respond to 209 --REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/12/2009. (BK)
June 11, 2009 217 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Jointly by Elsa Dorca Whitlock, Jaime Durand Palacios. (White, Marlow) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
June 10, 2009 216 NOTICE of Appearance by Gianluca Morello on behalf of Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (Morello, Gianluca)
June 10, 2009 215 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Richard Nelson on behalf of Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (Nelson, Carl)
June 10, 2009 214 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to File Objection to Report and Recommendation by Santiago de Alvear, Emilio de Alvear, Maria Eugenia Solveyra, Alejandro Julian Pera Barthe', Agustina Solveyra, Ignacio Solveyra. (McLaughlin, John)
June 10, 2009 213 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 212 --motion to extend to 7/6/2009 the time within which to object to report and recommendation; responses to objections due 8/7/2009. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/10/2009. (BK)
June 9, 2009 212 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to file objection to report and recommendation by Republic of Peru. (Shusta, Timothy)
June 8, 2009 211 Featured Case ORDER granting 210 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 209 Report and Recommendations The deadline to object to the June 3, 2009, report and recommendation is extended to July 6, 2009, and the deadline to respond to any objection is extended to August 7, 2009. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/8/2009. (TKD)
June 5, 2009 210 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Report and Recommendations by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc., Gonzalo de Aliaga, Agustin de Aliaga, Gonzalo Alvarez del Villar, Ignacio de Colmenares, Alberto Emilio Thiessen, Enriqueta Pita Duthurburu, Flora Leonor Perales Calderon de Colmenares, Felipe Voyest, Adela Armida de Izcue Bazo, Carola Daireaux Kinsky, Eleonora Daireaux Kinsky, Matilde Daireaux Kinsky, Julio Vega Eurasquin, Inez Marquez Osorio, Javier de Goyeneche, Juan Mariano de Goyeneche y Silvela. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
June 3, 2009 209 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 132 MOTION to vacate 5 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief pursuant to Supplemental Rule E(4)(f) filed by Kingdom of Spain, 131 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint or for summary judgment filed by Kingdom of Spain. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 6/3/2009. (JMF)
May 26, 2009 208 NOTICE of errata by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez re 207 Notice of filing exhibits. (Exhibit 18A and 31A filed under separate cover) (AG)
May 22, 2009 207 NOTICE of filing exhibits by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez re 175 Claim (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List) (Exhibits available in paper-format in the Clerk's Office 1 expandable folder)**Note - exhibits 1A, 2A and 9A were not included with filing**(AG)
May 4, 2009 206 REPLY to response to motion re 131 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint or for summary judgment Sur-Reply Re 161 filed by Republic of Peru. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of John Norton Moore)(Shusta, Timothy)
May 4, 2009 205 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 203 Motion for reconsideration. Peru's sur-reply is due on or before May 7, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 5/4/2009. (AGG)
May 1, 2009 204 Featured Case ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo for disposition: 203 --motion by the Republic of Peru for reconsideration of 201 --order denying motion for leave to file a sur-reply. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/1/2009. (BK)
April 30, 2009 203 MOTION for reconsideration re 201 Order on motion for leave to file by Republic of Peru. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re: Motion for Reconsideration)(Shusta, Timothy)
April 16, 2009 202 NOTICE of baptism certifications by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez in support of 175 Verified Claim(AG)
April 15, 2009 201 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER denying 197 Republic of Peru's motion for leave to file sur-reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 4/15/2009. (AGG)
April 10, 2009 200 Featured Case ORDER referring to Magistrate Mark A. Pizzo for disposition: 197 --motion by Republic of Peru for leave to file sur-reply. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/10/2009. (BK)
April 9, 2009 199 AFFIDAVIT of Mayra Sanchez Johnson re: 175 Claim by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez. (LYB)
April 9, 2009 198 NOTICE of filing Affidavit of Mayra Sanchez Johnson by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez (LYB)
April 7, 2009 197 MOTION for leave to file Sur-Reply to Doc 161 by Republic of Peru. (Shusta, Timothy)
April 6, 2009 196 RESPONSE in opposition re 190 MOTION to continue MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply of Joseph A. Rodriguez filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
April 3, 2009 195 OBJECTION re 190 MOTION to continue MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply of Joseph Anthony Rodriguez. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Modified on 4/6/2009 (MRH). NOTE: TERMINATED. INCORRECT CODE. ATTORNEY NOTIFIED. ATTORNEY TO REFILE.
April 2, 2009 194 NOTICE of compliance with CM/ECF Registration by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kimball, John)
March 23, 2009 193 AFFIDAVIT of Omar Argelio Menendez Sanchez re: 175 Claim by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez. (AG)
March 23, 2009 192 AFFIDAVIT of Cesar Menendez Alvarez re: 175 Claim by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez. (AG)
March 23, 2009 191 NOTICE of filing affidavits of Cesar Menendez Alvarez and Omar Menendez by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez (AG)
March 23, 2009 190 MOTION for a continuance to finalize geneology research, interview potential legal counsel and complete memorandum of law in support of verified claim; MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to plaintiff's response to verified claim by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez. (AG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
March 16, 2009 189 Featured Case ORDER granting 188 motion to appear pro hac vice. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 3/16/2009. (AGG)
March 13, 2009 188 Unopposed MOTION for John D. Kimball to appear pro hac vice by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of John D. Kimball)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
March 3, 2009 187 RESPONSE re 13 Claim Kingdom of Spain filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
March 2, 2009 186 RESPONSE re 168 Claim of Elsa D. Whitlock filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
March 2, 2009 185 RESPONSE re 176 Claim of Dr. Jaime Durand Palacios filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
March 2, 2009 184 RESPONSE re 175 Claim of Joseph Anthony Rodriguez filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
February 28, 2009 183 ***DOCUMENT TERMINATED*** RESPONSE re 168 Claim of Elsa D. Whitlock filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) (ERROR: document not signed; counsel has been notified and will re-file) Modified on 3/2/2009 (AG).
February 28, 2009 182 RESPONSE re 169 Amended document Verified Claim of Gonzalo de Aliaga (the Count of San Juan de Lurigancho) filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
February 27, 2009 181 RESPONSE re 164 Claim of Santiago de Alvear, et al. filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
February 27, 2009 180 ***DOCUMENT TERMINATED*** RESPONSE re 176 Claim of Dr. Jaime Durand Palacios filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (Pope, David) (ERROR: incorrect attorney signuture/login used; document not signed; counsel has been notified to re-file) Modified on 3/2/2009 (AG).
February 13, 2009 179 RESPONSE by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. to Kingdom of Spains' 163 REPLY to response to motion re 131 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint or for summary judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Modified on 2/17/2009 (AG).
February 12, 2009 178 RESPONSE to motion re 131 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint or for summary judgment of Kindom of Spain filed by Santiago de Alvear, Emilio de Alvear, Maria Eugenia Solveyra, Alejandro Julian Pera Barthe', Agustina Solveyra, Ignacio Solveyra. (McLaughlin, John)
February 10, 2009 177 RESPONSE to motion re 131 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint or for summary judgment filed by Gonzalo de Aliaga. (Horan, David)
February 4, 2009 176 CLAIM Verified by Jaime Durand Palacios. (Burnette, Guy)
February 3, 2009 174 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 170 Plaintiff's motion for leave to respond to the reply memorandum of Spain. Plaintiff's response is due on or before February 13, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 2/3/2009. (AGG)
February 2, 2009 175 VERIFIED CLAIM by Jose Antonio Rodriguez-Menendez. (AG)
February 2, 2009 173 Featured Case ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo for disposition: 170 --plaintiff's motion for leave to respond to Kingdom of Spain's reply memorandum. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/2/2009. (BK)
January 30, 2009 172 ***(DOCUMENT TERMINATED)***NOTICE by DR. JAIME DURAND PALACIOS VERIFIED CLAIM (Burnette, Guy) (ERROR: WRONG EVENT CODE USED; COUNSEL'S OFFICE HAS BEEN NOTIFIED AND INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILED) Modified on 2/2/2009 (AG).
January 30, 2009 171 RESPONSE in opposition re 170 MOTION for leave to file Response to Kingdom of Spain's Reply Memorandum to Odyssey's Response to Spain's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
January 30, 2009 170 MOTION for leave to file Response to Kingdom of Spain's Reply Memorandum to Odyssey's Response to Spain's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
January 29, 2009 169 AMENDED VERIFIED CLAIMS by Gonzalo de Aliaga, Agustin de Aliaga, Gonzalo Alvarez del Villar, Ignacio de Colmenares, Alberto Emilio Thiessen, Enriqueta Pita Duthurburu, Flora Leonor Perales Calderon de Colmenares, Felipe Voyset, Adela Armida de Izcue Baso, Carola Daireaux Kinsky, Eleonora Daireaux Kinsky, Matilde Daireaux, Julio Vega Erausquin, Inez Marquez Osorio, Javier de Goyeneche, Juan Mariano de Goyeneche y Silvela. (Horan, David) Modified on 1/30/2009 (AG).
January 29, 2009 168 CLAIM Verified by Elsa Dorca Whitlock. (White, Marlow)
January 28, 2009 167 ***DOCUMENT TERMINATED*** NOTICE by Elsa Dorca Whitlock Verified Claim (White, Marlow) (ERROR: WRONG EVENT CODE USED; COUNSEL CONTACTED THE CLERK'S OFFICE AND HAS RE-FILED THE DOCUMENT AT ENTRY NO. 168 ) Modified on 1/29/2009 (AG).
January 27, 2009 166 ***DOCUMENT TERMINATED*** CLAIM Amended Verified Claims of Named Descendants by Alejandro Julian Pera Barthe'. (McLaughlin, John) (ERROR: DUPLICATE DOCUMENT OF ENTRY NO. 164 )Modified on 1/28/2009 (AG).
January 27, 2009 165 ***DOCUMENT TERMINATED*** CLAIM Amended Verified Claims of Named Descendants by Maria Eugenia Solveyra, Agustina Solveyra, Ignacio Solveyra. (McLaughlin, John) (ERROR: DUPLICATE DOCUMENT OF ENTRY NO. 164 ) Modified on 1/28/2009 (AG).
January 27, 2009 164 CLAIM Amended Verified Claims of Named Descendants by Santiago de Alvear, Emilio de Alvear, Maria Eugenia Solveyra, Alejandro Julian Pera Barthe, Agustina Solveyra and Ignacio Solveyra. (McLaughlin, John) Modified on 1/28/2009 (AG).
January 26, 2009 163 REPLY to response to motion re 131 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint or for summary judgment (Reply to Odyssey) filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2, # 4 Exhibit B-3, # 5 Exhibit B-4, # 6 Exhibit B-5, # 7 Exhibit B-6, # 8 Exhibit B-7, # 9 Exhibit C-1, # 10 Exhibit C-2, # 11 Exhibit C-3, # 12 Exhibit C-4, # 13 Exhibit C-5, # 14 Exhibit C-6, # 15 Exhibit D)(Goold, James)
January 26, 2009 162 REPLY to response to motion re 131 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint or for summary judgment filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - World Map of Colonialism in 1800)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
January 26, 2009 161 REPLY to response to motion re 131 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint or for summary judgment (Reply to the Republic of Peru) filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Goold, James)
January 20, 2009 160 Featured Case ORDER granting 128 Motion to set a deadline for claims; granting 158 Renewed Motion to set a deadline for claims. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 1/20/2009. (AGG)
January 16, 2009 159 Featured Case ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo for disposition: 158 --plaintiff's second motion to set deadline for claims. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/16/2009. (BK)
January 15, 2009 158 Second MOTION to set Deadline for Filing Claims by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order on Renewed Motion to Set Deadline for Claims)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
January 9, 2009 157 CLAIM Verified by Santiago de Alvear, Emilio de Alvear, Maria Eugenia Solveyra, Alejandro Julian Pera Barthe', Agustina Solveyra, Ignacio Solveyra. (McLaughlin, John)
January 8, 2009 156 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: on 1/8/2009. (DIGITAL) Court Reporter: Linda Starr (AGG)
January 6, 2009 155 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 153 Motion for Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 1/6/2009. (DK)
January 6, 2009 154 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 1/8/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 B before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo (DK)
January 5, 2009 153 Unopposed MOTION for status conference on January 8, 2009 by Republic of Peru. (Shusta, Timothy)
December 4, 2008 152 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 151 Odyssey's Motion for leave to file a reply to the Republic of Peru's response to Spain's motion to dismiss or for summary judgment. Odyssey's reply is not to exceed twenty-five (25) pages and is due on or before January 26, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 12/4/2008. (AGG)
December 2, 2008 151 MOTION for leave to file to file a reply to the Republic of Peru's Response to the Kingdom of Spain's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
December 1, 2008 150 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 147 Motion for leave to file a reply of no more than twenty-five pages. The reply is due on or before January 26, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 12/1/2008. (JMF)
December 1, 2008 149 Featured Case ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo for disposition: 147 -- unopposed motion by the Kingdom of Spain for leave to file a reply. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/1/2008. (BK)
November 26, 2008 148 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 144 Claimant Spain's motion for leave to file a response/reply to opposition of Plaintiff to Spain's motion to dismiss or for summary judgment. Spain's reply is not to exceed thirty (30) pages and is due on or before January 26, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 11/26/2008. (AGG)
November 25, 2008 147 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file a response to the opposition of claimant Republic of Peru to Spain's motion to dismiss or for summary judgment by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
November 24, 2008 146 Featured Case ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo for disposition: 144 -- Kingdom of Spain's motion for leave to file a reply to 138 --Odyssey Marine's opposition to 131 --Kingdom of Spain's motion to dismiss or for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/24/2008. (BK)
November 21, 2008 145 OBJECTION re 144 MOTION for leave to file a response to the opposition of Plaintiff Odyssey Marine Exploration to Spain's motion to dismiss or for summary judgment. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
November 21, 2008 144 MOTION for leave to file a response to the opposition of Plaintiff Odyssey Marine Exploration to Spain's motion to dismiss or for summary judgment by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
November 20, 2008 143 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 139 Claimant Peru's motion for leave to file memorandum in excess of Local Rule 3.01 page limits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 11/20/2008. (AGG)
November 19, 2008 142 Featured Case ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo for disposition: 139 --motion by the Republic of Peru for leave to exceed the Local Rule's page limits. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/19/2008. (BK)
November 17, 2008 141 RESPONSE in opposition re 131 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint or for summary judgment filed by Republic of Peru. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Vienna Convention)(Shusta, Timothy)
November 17, 2008 140 RESPONSE to motion re 132 MOTION to vacate 5 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief pursuant to Supplemental Rule E(4)(f) filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
November 17, 2008 139 MOTION for leave to file Memorandum in Excess of Local Rule 3.01 Page Limits by Republic of Peru. (Shusta, Timothy)
November 17, 2008 138 RESPONSE to motion re 131 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint or for summary judgment filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Index of Exhibits to Odyssey's Response to Spain's Motion, # 2 Exhibit A-1 Kingsley Part 1, # 3 Exhibit A-2 Kingsley Part 2, Annex 1, # 4 Exhibit A-2 Kingsley Part 2, Annex 2, # 5 Exhibit A-2 Kingsley Part 2, Annex 3, # 6 Exhibit A-3 Kingsley Part 3, Annex 4, # 7 Exhibit A-3 Kingsley Part 3, Annex 5, # 8 Exhibit A-3 Kingsley Part 3, Annex 6, # 9 Exhibit A-4 Kingsley Part 4, Annex 7, # 10 Exhibit A-5 Kingsley Part 5, Annex 8, # 11 Exhibit A-4 Kingsley Part 4, Annex 9, # 12 Exhibit A-5 Kingsley Part 5, Annex 10.1-10.2, # 13 Exhibit A-5 Kingsley Part 5, Annex 10.3-10.6, # 14 Exhibit A-5 Kingsley Part 5, Annex 11, # 15 Exhibit A-6 Kingsley Part 6, Annex 12 to 13.1, # 16 Exhibit A-7 Kingsley Part 7, Annex 13.2 to 13.3, # 17 Exhibit A-8 Kingsley Part 8, Annex 13.4 to 13.7, # 18 Exhibit A-9 Kingsley Part 9, Annex 14, # 19 Exhibit A-10 Kingsley Part 10, Annex 15, # 20 Exhibit A-11 Kingsley Part 11, Annex 16, # 21 Exhibit A-11 Kingsley Part 11, Annex 17, # 22 Exhibit A-11 Kingsley Part 11, Annex 18, # 23 Exhibit A-12 Kingsley Part 12, Annex 19, # 24 Exhibit A-12 Kingsley Part 12, Annex 20, # 25 Exhibit a-13 Kingsley Part 13, Anex 21, # 26 Exhibit A-13 Kingsley Part 13, Annex 22, # 27 Exhibit B Sinclair, # 28 Exhibit C Etchevers, # 29 Exhibit D Stemm, # 30 Exhibit E-1 Carlisle Part 1, # 31 Exhibit E-2 Carlisle Part 2, Annex 1, # 32 Exhibit E-2 Carlisle Part 2, Annex 2, # 33 Exhibit E2- Carlisle Part 2, Annex 3, # 34 Exhibit E-2 Carlisle Part 2, Annex 4, # 35 Exhibit E-2 Carlisle Part 2, Annex 5, # 36 Exhibit E-2 Carlisle Part 2, Annex 6, # 37 Exhibit E-2 Carlisle Part 2, Annex 7, # 38 Exhibit E-2 Carlisle Part 2, Annex 8, # 39 Exhibit E-2 Carlisle Part 2, Annex 9, # 40 Exhibit E-3 Carlisle Part 3, Annex 10, # 41 Exhibit E-3 Carlisle Part 3, Annex 11, # 42 Exhibit E-3 Carlisle Part 3, Annex 12, # 43 Exhibit E-3 Carlisle Part 3, Annex 13, # 44 Exhibit E-3 Carlisle Part 3, Annex 14, # 45 Exhibit E-3 Carlisle Part 3, Annex 15, # 46 Exhibit E-3 Carlisle Part 3, Annex 16, # 47 Exhibit E-3 Carlisle Part 3, Annex 17, # 48 Exhibit Ej-3 Carlisle Part 3, Annex 18, # 49 Exhibit e-3 Carlisle Part 3, Annex 19, # 50 Exhibit E-3 Carlisle Part 3, Annex 20, # 51 Exhibit E-4 Carlisle Part 4, Annex 21, # 52 Exhibit E-4 Carlisle Part 4, Annex 22, # 53 Exhibit E-5 Carlisle Part 5, Annex 23, # 54 Exhibit E-5 Carlisle Part 5, Annex 24, # 55 Exhibit E-5 Carlisle Part 5, Annex 25, # 56 Exhibit E-6 Carlisle Part 6, Annex 26, # 57 Exhibit E-6 Carlisle Part 6, Annex 27, # 58 Exhibit E-7 Carlisle Part 7, Annex 28, # 59 Exhibit E-8 Carlisle Part 8, Annex 29, # 60 Exhibit E-9 Carlisle Part 9, Annex 30, # 61 Exhibit E-9 Carlisle Part 9, Annex 31, # 62 Exhibit E-10 Carlisle Part 10, Annex 32, # 63 Exhibit F-1 Flayhart, Part 1, # 64 Exhibit F-2 Flayhart Part 2, Annex 1, # 65 Exhibit F-2 Flayhart Part 2, Annex 2, # 66 Exhibit F-2 Flayhart Part 2, Annex 3, # 67 Exhibit F-2 Flayhart Part 2, Annex 4, # 68 Exhibit F-2 Flayhart Part 2, Annex 5, # 69 Exhibit F-2 Flayhart Part 2, Annex 6, # 70 Exhibit F-3 Flayhart Part 3, Annex 7, # 71 Exhibit F-3 Flayhart Part 3, Annex 8, # 72 Exhibit F-3 Flayhart Part 3, Annex 9, # 73 Exhibit F-3 Flayhart Part 3, Annex 10, # 74 Exhibit F-3 Flayhart Part 3, Annex 11, # 75 Exhibit F-4 Flayhart Part 4, Annex 12, # 76 Exhibit F-4 Flayhart Part 4, Annex 13, # 77 Exhibit F-4 Flayhart Part 4, Annex 14, # 78 Exhibit F-4 Flayhart Part 4, Annex 15, # 79 Exhibit F-4 Flayhart Part 4, Annex 16, # 80 Exhibit F-4 flayhart Part 4, Annex 17, # 81 Exhibit F-5 flayhart Part 5, Annex 18, # 82 Exhibit F-5 Flayhart Part 5, Annex 19, # 83 Exhibit F-5 Flayhart Part 5, Annex 20, # 84 Exhibit F-5 Flayhart Part 5, Annex 21, # 85 Exhibit F-5 Flayhart Part 5, Annex 22, # 86 Exhibit F-5 Flayhart Part 5, Annex 23, # 87 Exhibit F-5 Flayhart Part 5, Annex 24, # 88 Exhibit F-5 Flayhart Part 5, Annex 25, # 89 Exhibit G Goni Etchevers and Fuentes Camacho, # 90 Exhibit H Tedesco, # 91 Exhibit I Tsokos, # 92 Exhibit J Amrhein)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
November 14, 2008 137 NOTICE of change of address by Allen K. Von Spiegelfeld (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
November 14, 2008 136 Verified CLAIMS by Gonzalo de Aliaga, Agustin de Aliaga, Gonzalo Alvarez del Villar, Ignacio de Colmenares, Alberto Emilio Thiessen, Enriqueta Pita Duthurburu, Flora Leonor Perales Calderon de Colmenares, Felipe Voyest, Adela Armida de Izcue Bazo, Carola Daireaux Kinsky, Eleonora Daireaux Kinsky, Matilde Daireaux Kinsky, Julio Vega Eurasquin, Inez Marquez Osorio, Javier de Goyeneche. (Horan, David) Modified on 11/14/2008 (AG).
September 26, 2008 Sealed document S-5 (AG)
September 26, 2008 135 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 133 Motion to Seal Exhibits B and E to Spain's Motion to dismiss Amended Complaint or for summary judgment (Doc. 131). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 9/26/2008. (AGG)
September 25, 2008 134 Featured Case ORDER: referring to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo for preparation of a report and recommendation: motions by Kingdom of Spain 131 to dismiss amended complaint or for summary judgment and 132 to vacate order (Doc. 5); referring to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo for disposition: motion by Kingdom of Spain 133 to seal. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/25/2008. (BK)
September 22, 2008 133 MOTION with incoporated memorandum of law to seal pursuant to orders of January 10 and March 12, 2008 re: Exhibits B and E to Spain's dispositive motion, by Kingdom of Spain. (AG)
September 22, 2008 132 MOTION to vacate 5 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief pursuant to Supplemental Rule E(4)(f) by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
September 22, 2008 131 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint or for summary judgment by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Non-Confidential Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit A-4, # 6 Exhibit A-5, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D-1, # 9 Exhibit D-2, # 10 Exhibit D-3, # 11 Exhibit D-4, # 12 Exhibit D-5, # 13 Exhibit D-6, # 14 Exhibit D-7, # 15 Exhibit F, # 16 Exhibit G, # 17 Exhibit H, # 18 Exhibit I)(Goold, James)
September 22, 2008 130 NOTICE by Republic of Peru re 122 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice of Compliance of Mark Maney, Esq. (Shusta, Timothy)
September 19, 2008 129 Featured Case ORDER referring motion to Magistrate Judge for disposition: 128 MOTION to Set Deadline for Claims filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/19/2008. (TKD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
September 17, 2008 128 MOTION to Set Deadline for Claims by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
September 12, 2008 127 NOTICE by Republic of Peru re 122 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice of Compliance (Shusta, Timothy)
September 11, 2008 126 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 124 Agreed Motion for leave to file motions in excess of Local Rule 3.01 page limits.Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 9/11/2008. (AGG)
September 11, 2008 125 Featured Case ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo for disposition: 124 --joint motion for leave to file a motion and a response in excess of the page limit set in Local Rule 3.01. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/11/2008. (BK)
September 10, 2008 124 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Motions in Excess of Local Rule 3.01 Page Limits by Kingdom of Spain. (Banker, David)
September 4, 2008 123 RESPONSE re 120 Claim of The Republic of Peru by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
September 2, 2008 122 Featured Case ORDER granting 121 motion to appear pro hac vice. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 9/2/2008. (DK)
August 28, 2008 121 Unopposed MOTION for Mark Maney to appear pro hac vice by Republic of Peru. (Shusta, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
August 19, 2008 120 CLAIM to contents, artifacts and cargo by Republic of Peru. (Shusta, Timothy)
July 11, 2008 119 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 117 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 7/11/2008. (DK)
July 11, 2008 118 Featured Case ORDER referring to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo for disposition: 117 --motion by Spain to extend filing deadlines. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/11/2008. (BK)
July 8, 2008 117 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Spain's Dispositive Motion and Odyssey's Response Thereto by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
June 23, 2008 116 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Dennis Miracle (DM)
June 23, 2008 115 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 6/9/08 before Judge Mark A. Pizzo. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dennis Miracle,Telephone number 352/369-7401. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 7/14/2008, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2008, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2008. (DM)
June 11, 2008 114 Featured Case ORDER directing the Kingdom of Spain to file its motion asserting immunity on or before August 11, 2008, and directing Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc., to file its response on or before October 10, 2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 6/11/2008. (MTT)
June 9, 2008 113 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 6/9/2008. (digital) (MTT)
May 28, 2008 112 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16(a) Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11 B before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. (MTT)
May 22, 2008 111 Featured Case ORDER denying 109 Motion to compel and striking affidavit of Gregory P. Stemm. The Clerk is directed to return the affidavit to Odyssey's counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 5/22/2008. (DK)
May 15, 2008 110 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 109 Motion to compel Affidavit Filed Under Seal filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
May 13, 2008 109 MOTION to compel service of affidavit filed under seal (Dkt. S-2) by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Goold, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
May 12, 2008 108 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 86 Motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 5/12/2008. (MTT)
May 8, 2008 107 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: 92 Order on motion to compelOrder on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
April 28, 2008 106 RECEIPT for return of exhibits and/or exhibit substitutes as to Kingdom of Spain (AG)
April 17, 2008 105 ANSWER to court interrogatories by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (AG)
April 17, 2008 104 Featured Case ORDER denying 99 Motion for protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 4/17/2008. (MTT)
April 17, 2008 103 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: Telephone Conference held on 4/17/2008. (DIGITAL) (MTT)
April 15, 2008 102 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 3/5/08 before Judge Mark A. Pizzo. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson. (Entire Transcript is filed with 8:06-cv-1685). (RFM)
April 15, 2008 101 Featured Case ORDER granting 96 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 4/15/2008. (MTT)
April 14, 2008 100 RESPONSE to motion re 99 MOTION for protective order (Expedited) filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1 English Translation of Article, # 2 Spanish Version of Article)(Banker, David)
April 11, 2008 Sealed document S-4 (AG) (DOCUMENT UNSEALED PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S 104 ORDER) (SEE ENTRY NO. 105 FOR THIS DOCUMENT) Modified on 4/18/2008 (AG).
April 11, 2008 99 MOTION for protective order by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
April 4, 2008 98 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 28 --motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/4/2008. (BK)
April 3, 2008 97 AFFIDAVIT of K. Russell LaMotte re: 96 Unopposed MOTION for K. Russell LaMotte to appear pro hac vice by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
April 3, 2008 96 Unopposed MOTION for K. Russell LaMotte to appear pro hac vice by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
April 2, 2008 95 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 93 Motion to conduct hearing in camera. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 4/2/2008. (MTT)
April 2, 2008 94 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: Telephone Conference held on 4/2/2008. (DIGITAL) (MTT)
March 31, 2008 93 MOTION to Conduct Hearing In Camera by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
March 14, 2008 Sealed document S-3 (AG)
March 12, 2008 92 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion to compel; granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion for an Order Declaring Certain Materials as Not Confidential. The Clerk is directed to return to Spain the items filed by Spain under seal as attachments to its Motion for leave to File Under Seal (doc. 84). The parties shall answer the Court interrogatories as set forth in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 3/12/2008. (DK)
March 6, 2008 91 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 --motion to dismiss; denying 16 --motion for more definite statement. Counts 3-6 are dismissed. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/6/2008. (BK)
March 5, 2008 90 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 3/5/2008. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (MTT)
March 4, 2008 89 AFFIDAVIT of Frederick Van De Walle re: 79 Response to motion by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
March 4, 2008 88 RESPONSE to motion re 86 Supplemental MOTION to compel compliance with disclosure order relating to photographs and videotapes filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Composite Exhibit A)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
March 4, 2008 87 RESPONSE to motion re 84 MOTION for leave to file under seal filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
March 3, 2008 Sealed document. (filed pursuant to the Court's 85 order - See entry S-1 under case number 8:06-cv-1685-T-23MAP for this document). (AG) ***DOCUMENTS RETURNED TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S 92 ORDER*** Modified on 3/12/2008 (AG).
March 3, 2008 86 Supplemental MOTION to compel compliance with disclosure order relating to photographs and videotapes by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
March 3, 2008 85 Featured Case ORDER denying 81 Motion to conduct March 5, 2008 hearing in camera; granting 84 Motion for leave to file under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 3/3/2008. (MTT)
February 28, 2008 84 MOTION for leave to file under seal by Kingdom of Spain. (AG)
February 22, 2008 83 Featured Case ORDER ruling deferred 78 Motion seeking an order finding certain materials disclosed to Spain by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. are not confidential. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 2/22/2008. (DK)
February 20, 2008 82 RESPONSE in opposition re 81 MOTION to Conduct March 5 Hearing In Camera filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
February 19, 2008 81 MOTION to Conduct March 5 Hearing In Camera by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
February 8, 2008 80 RESPONSE to motion re 78 MOTION to declare certain materials as not confidential under the protective order filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
February 8, 2008 79 RESPONSE to motion re 77 MOTION to compel compliance with disclosure order and for other relief filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
February 1, 2008 78 MOTION to declare certain materials as not confidential under the protective order by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Goold, James)
February 1, 2008 77 MOTION to compel compliance with disclosure order and for other relief by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Goold, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
January 10, 2008 Sealed document S-2 (AG) (STRICKEN AND RETURNED PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S 111 ORDER) Modified on 5/23/2008 (AG).
January 10, 2008 76 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCLOSURE OF CERTAIN INFORMATION Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 1/10/2008. (DK)
January 10, 2008 75 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion for protective order; granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 1/10/2008. (DK)
January 10, 2008 74 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/10/2008. Court Reporter: Sandra K. Lee (DK)
January 9, 2008 73 MEMORANDUM in support re 72 Motion for protective order filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
January 9, 2008 72 MOTION for protective order by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
January 9, 2008 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Dennis Skorewicz on behalf of Kingdom of Spain (Skorewicz, Keith)
January 9, 2008 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Carter Andersen on behalf of Kingdom of Spain (Andersen, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2007 69 NOTICE by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. re 44 Summons issued of Status of Service of Process on Kingdom of Spain (Thiel, Eric)
December 21, 2007 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda Joy MacConnel on behalf of Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (MacConnel, Melinda)
November 28, 2007 67 Featured Case ORDER setting forth procedures for identical or parallel filings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 11/28/2007. (MTT)
November 26, 2007 66 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/26/2007. (MTT)
November 19, 2007 65 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: 61 Order setting preliminary pretrial by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
November 13, 2007 64 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: 61 Order setting preliminary pretrial by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
November 7, 2007 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. re 61 Order setting preliminary pretrial (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
November 5, 2007 62 REPLY to response to motion re 37 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and for Other Relief filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
November 2, 2007 61 Featured Case ORDER setting preliminary pretrial. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/26/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11 B before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/2/2007. (maa)
October 30, 2007 60 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 26, 2007 59 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 58 --motion by Kingdom of Spain to reply to 53 --plaintiff's opposition to motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/26/2007. (BK)
October 25, 2007 58 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Claimant's Motion to Dismiss by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
October 22, 2007 57 REPLY to response to motion re 28 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 22, 2007 56 REQUEST for oral argument re 26 MOTION for protective order Regarding Preliminary Site Assessment , Motion for Order Granting Preliminary Injunctive Relief, and Spain's Motion to Dismiss and for Other Relief by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 22, 2007 55 ***DOCUMENT TERMINATED*** REPLY to response to motion re 28 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) (ERROR: WRONG IMAGE ATTACHED; COUNSEL HAS CONTACTED AND NOTIFIED THE CLERK'S OFFICE; COUNSEL HAS FILED THE CORRECT IMAGE AT ENTRY NO 57 ) Modified on 10/23/2007 (ag).
October 22, 2007 54 REPLY to response to motion re 26 MOTION for protective order Regarding Preliminary Site Assessment filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 22, 2007 53 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 37 Motion to dismiss filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 10, 2007 52 Featured Case ORDER granting 51 --motion to extend to 10/30/2007 the time within which to file a case management report. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/10/2007. (BK)
October 10, 2007 51 Second MOTION to extend time to File Completed Case Management Report (Joint Motion) by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
October 9, 2007 50 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Reply due 10/22/2007. Signed by Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 10/9/2007. (MTT)
October 5, 2007 49 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 47 --motion to enlarge the time within which to respond to 37 --motion to dismiss amended complaint. Response due 10/22/2007. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/4/2007. (BK)
October 5, 2007 48 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 45 --motion to extend the time within which to reply to 38 --response to 23 --motion for preliminary injunction. Reply due 10/22/2007. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/4/2007. (BK) Modified text on 11/20/2007 (RFM).
October 3, 2007 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 37 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and for Other Relief by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Thiel, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
October 3, 2007 46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 39 Memorandum in opposition to Motion for Protective Order by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Thiel, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
October 3, 2007 45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 Memorandum in opposition to Motion for Order Granting Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Thiel, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
September 28, 2007 43 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 41 --Odyssey's motion for leave to file a five-page reply to 39 --Spain's opposition to 22 --Odyssey's motion for protective order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/28/2007. (BK)
September 28, 2007 42 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 40 --Odyssey's motion for leave to file a five-page reply to 38 --Spain's opposition to 28 --Odyssey's motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/28/2007. (BK)
September 27, 2007 44 Summons issued as to Kingdom of Spain. (ag)
September 26, 2007 41 MOTION for leave to file Reply to Claimant Kingdom of Spain's Opposition to Motion for Protective Order by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
September 26, 2007 40 MOTION for leave to file Reply to Claimant Kingdom of Spain's Opposition to Motion for Order Granting Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
September 19, 2007 39 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 22 Motion for protective order, 26 Motion for protective order filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
September 19, 2007 38 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 23 Motion for preliminary injunction, 28 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
September 19, 2007 37 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and for Other Relief by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit UK Export Documents)(Goold, James)
September 7, 2007 36 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 35 plaintiff's Joint Motion for extension of time to file completed case management report. The case management report is due on or before 10/9/2007. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/7/2007. (maa)
September 6, 2007 35 Joint MOTION to extend time to File Completed Case Management Report by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
August 16, 2007 Case Reassigned to Judge Steven D. Merryday. New case number: 8:07-cv-614-T-23MAP. Judge Susan C Bucklew no longer assigned to the case. (ag)
August 16, 2007 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 33 Motion to transfer; reassigning this case to the Honorable Steven D. Merryday for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 1.04(b). Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 8/16/2007. (lc, )
August 16, 2007 33 MOTION to amend/correct and Refile Motion of Kingdom of Spain for Transfer of Related Cases by Kingdom of Spain. (Banker, David)
August 16, 2007 32 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 26 MOTION for protective order, 28 MOTION for preliminary injunction. Responses due by 9/19/2007. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 8/16/2007. (lc, )
August 15, 2007 31 NOTICE by Kingdom of Spain of Motion to Transfer Related Cases (Local Rule 1.04(b)) (Goold, James)
August 14, 2007 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 25 Amended complaint, 26 MOTION for protective order Regarding Preliminary Site Assessment, 28 MOTION for preliminary injunction by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
August 8, 2007 29 NOTICE of Re-designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 with Notice of Expected Deadlines and Case Management Report made a part herein. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 8/8/2007. (ls)
August 7, 2007 28 MOTION for preliminary injunction by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
August 7, 2007 27 AFFIDAVIT of Gregory P. Stemm re: 26 MOTION for protective order Regarding Preliminary Site Assessment by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
August 7, 2007 26 MOTION for protective order Regarding Preliminary Site Assessment by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
August 7, 2007 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Unidentified Shipwrecked Vessel filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Sworn Statement of Greg Stemm - Part 1# 2 Sworn Statement of Greg Stemm - Part 2)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
August 6, 2007 24 US Marshal 285 form for artifacts from unidentified shipwrecked vessel, its apparel, tackle, etc served on sub. custodian @ USMS Office on 4/13/07. (bn) Modified on 8/7/07 (bn).
August 6, 2007 23 MOTION for preliminary injunction by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Modified on 8/8/2007 (jlh, ). TERMED; REFILED AT DOC 28
August 6, 2007 22 MOTION for protective order Regarding Preliminary Site Assessment by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Greg Stemm# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo. Modified on 8/8/2007 (jlh, ). TERMINATED; REFILED AT DOC. 26.
August 6, 2007 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Unidentified Shipwrecked Vessel filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Sworn Statement of Greg Stemm - Part 1# 2 Sworn Statement of Greg Stemm - Part 2)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) COUNSEL TO REFILE LISTING PARTIES PROPERLY. Modified on 8/7/2007 (RFM).
July 24, 2007 20 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 16 Kingdom of Spain's MOTION for more definite statement. Plaintiff's response is due on or before Monday, August 6, 2007. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 7/24/2007. (lc, )
July 23, 2007 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION for more definite statement and/or other relief by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
June 27, 2007 18 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 16 Kingdom of Spain's MOTION for more definite statement. Plaintiff's response is due on or before 7/23/2007. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 6/27/2007. (lc, )
June 26, 2007 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION for more definite statement and/or other relief by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo.
June 19, 2007 16 MOTION for more definite statement and/or other relief by Kingdom of Spain. (Goold, James)
June 18, 2007 15 CERTIFICATE of Counsel on Compliance with CM/ECF Registration by James Goold on behalf of Kingdom of Spain (Goold, James)
June 6, 2007 14 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 motion to appear pro hac vice. James A. Goold is directed to sign up for CM/ECF, enter an email address in his CM/ECF account, and electronically file a notice of compliance with this Court's Order by July 6th, 2007. The Clerk is directed not to send paper copies to Mr. Goold after sending this Order. Signed by Judge Susan C Bucklew on 6/6/2007. (lc, )
June 1, 2007 12 Unopposed MOTION for James A. Goold to appear pro hac vice by Kingdom of Spain. (Banker, David)
May 31, 2007 13 CLAIM Property by Kingdom of Spain. (Attachments: # 1)(ag)
May 14, 2007 11 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/14/2007. (ls )
May 7, 2007 10 PROOF OF PUBLICATION filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. Newspaper: The Tampa Tribune Date(s) of publication 4/30/07. (Thiel, Eric)
May 4, 2007 9 NOTICE by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. Filing Proof of Publication of Notice of Arrest (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit C. Pugh/Tampa Tribune)(Thiel, Eric) (ERROR: WRONG CODE USED; COUNSEL'S OFFICE HAS BEEN NOTIFIED AND INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE) Modified on 5/7/2007 (ag).
April 25, 2007 Sealed document S-1 (AG)
April 13, 2007 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Plaintiff's Motion for appointment of substitute custodian. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/13/2007. (MEH)
April 13, 2007 7 MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Consent and Indemnification Agreement)(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
April 12, 2007 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion directing the issue of a warrant of arrest. Signed by Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 4/12/2007. (WGL, )
April 12, 2007 4 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 2 Motion to seal. Signed by Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 4/12/2007. (WGL, )
April 11, 2007 3 MOTION Order Directing Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest In Rem by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
April 11, 2007 2 MOTION for leave to file under seal and Memorandum of Law in Support by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
April 9, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against The Unidentified Shipwrecked Vessel (Filing fee $350.00 receipt number T041140) filed by Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc. v. The Unidentified Shipwrecked Vessel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kingdom of Spain
Represented By: David Christopher Banker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odyssey Marine Exploration, Inc.
Represented By: Melinda Joy MacConnel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unidentified Shipwrecked Vessel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]