Lee v. PMSI, Inc. Featured Case

Mediator: Mary A. Lau
Counter_claimant: PMSI, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Wendi J. Lee
Plaintiff: Wendi J. Lee
Defendant: PMSI, Inc.
 
Case Number: 8:2010cv02904
Filed: December 27, 2010
 
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Referring Judge: Thomas B. McCoun
Presiding Judge: Steven D. Merryday
 
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2011 20 Featured Case ORDER dismissing action; directing the Clerk to TERMINATE any pending motion and CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/9/2011. (BK)
June 7, 2011 19 NOTICE of Settlement by Wendi J. Lee (Hewitt, Scott)
May 6, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 --motion to strike counterclaim; dismissing the defendant's counterclaim with prejudice; reinstating 5 --the defendant's original answer. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/6/2011. (BK)
March 10, 2011 17 RESPONSE in opposition re 13 MOTION to strike Defendant's Untimely Amended Pleading and Counterclaim or Alternativly to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim filed by PMSI, Inc.. (Bradford, Richard)
March 7, 2011 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 9 Case management and scheduling order by Wendi J. Lee. (Hewitt, Scott)
March 4, 2011 15 NOTICE by Wendi J. Lee of Certificate of Interested Person (Hewitt, Scott) Modified on 3/7/2011 (MRH). NOTE: TERMINATED. INCORRECT CODE. ATTORNEY NOTIFIED. ATTORNEY TO REFILE.
March 3, 2011 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by PMSI, Inc.. (Bradford, Richard)
February 21, 2011 13 MOTION to strike Defendant's Untimely Amended Pleading and Counterclaim or Alternativly to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim by Wendi J. Lee. (Hewitt, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III.
February 7, 2011 12 AMENDED ANSWER to 2 Complaint Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Wendi J. Lee by PMSI, Inc.. (Bradford, Richard) Doc. 18 strikes the counterclaim. Modified on 5/6/2011 (BK).
February 3, 2011 11 NOTICE of mediation hearing to be held on 6/14/2011 @ 1:00 p.m. before Mary Lau.(Hewitt, Scott)
January 28, 2011 10 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to mediation before Mary A. Lau. Lead counsel Scott K. Hewitt to coordinate dates and file notice of mediation within 20 days. Mediation shall be conducted on or before June 25, 2011. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/28/2011. (TKD)
January 25, 2011 9 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 6/3/2011, Discovery due by 8/5/2011, Dispositive motions due by 9/2/2011, Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2011 at 11:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12 B before Magistrate Judge Thomas B. McCoun III, Jury Trial set for the December, 2011, trial term in Tampa Courtroom 15 A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/25/2011. (TKD)
January 18, 2011 8 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hewitt, Scott)
January 13, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER denying 4 --motion to dismiss count two. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/13/2011. (BK)
January 11, 2011 6 RESPONSE in opposition re 4 MOTION to dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint with Memorandum of Law filed by Wendi J. Lee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Case Law)(Hewitt, Scott)
January 4, 2011 5 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 2 Complaint by PMSI, Inc..(Cabassa, Luis)
January 4, 2011 4 MOTION to dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint by PMSI, Inc.. (Cabassa, Luis)
January 3, 2011 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 (TKD)
December 27, 2010 2 COMPLAINT filed in state court against PMSI, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Wendi J. Lee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(CH)
December 27, 2010 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the 13th Judicial Circuit in and for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 10-23614, filed in State Court on 12/10/10. Filing fee $350, receipt number TPA2686 filed by PMSI, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lee v. PMSI, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Mary A. Lau
Represented By: Mary A. Lau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: PMSI, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Bradford
Represented By: Luis A. Cabassa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Wendi J. Lee
Represented By: Scott Kenneth Hewitt
Represented By: Samuel R. Mandelbaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendi J. Lee
Represented By: Samuel R. Mandelbaum
Represented By: Scott Kenneth Hewitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMSI, Inc.
Represented By: Luis A. Cabassa
Represented By: Richard L. Bradford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]