Flomenhoft et al v. Georgia-Pacific LLC et al

Plaintiff: Mark Flomenhoft and Linda Flomenhoft
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC and Union Carbide Corporation
 
Case Number: 8:2012cv02496
Filed: November 2, 2012
 
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Referring Judge: Anthony E. Porcelli
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
 
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2013 129 Opinion or Order of the Court 60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: All pending motions, if any, are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/23/2013. (LN)
February 12, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/12/2013. (LN)
June 17, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider the Extension of Fact Discovery Deadline to Depose Thomas Roma 41 is DENIED. As the Court previously held, the fact discovery deadline is extended to the extent that Defendant Georgia-Pacific may depo se non-party witness Thomas Roma. Defendant Georgia-Pacific LLC's Motion to Extend the Fact Discovery Deadline to Take the Deposition of Bruce R. Ahlum and to Inspect the "Stoneridge Home" 42 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The fact discovery deadline is extended to the extent that Defendant Georgia-Pacific may depose non-party witness Bruce Ahlum. The issue of whether Georgia-Pacific may inspect the "Stoneridge Home" is a matter left to the parties and Mr. Ahlum to determine. All remaining deadlines in this case remain unchanged. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/17/2013. (LN)
July 10, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant Georgia-Pacific LLCss Motion for Partial Final Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Linda Flomenhoft's Consortium Claim 48 is GRANTED to the extent stated herein. The Clerk is directed to enter a Partial Final Judgment in Defendant Georgia-Pacific LLC's favor and against Plaintiff Linda Flomenhoft on Plaintiff Linda Flomenhoft's loss of consortium claim. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/10/2013. (LN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Flomenhoft et al v. Georgia-Pacific LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Flomenhoft
Represented By: Marc Kunen
Represented By: David A. Jagolinzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Flomenhoft
Represented By: Marc Kunen
Represented By: David A. Jagolinzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Represented By: Jana Marie Fried
Represented By: Laura E. Eggnatz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Frank I. Chao
Represented By: Evelyn F. Davis
Represented By: Catherine A. McCormack
Represented By: Frances Spinthourakis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]