Mecca v. Florida Health Sciences Center, Inc.

Defendant: Florida Health Sciences Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Daniel Mecca
Case Number: 8:2012cv02561
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Referring Judge: Thomas B. McCoun
Presiding Judge: Mary S. Scriven
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Count II and Count V are dismissed with prejudice. Count I, Count III, Count IV, and Count VI are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff Mecca may replead his Complaint (with the exception of Count II and Count V) within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 1/10/2013. (LN)
February 3, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 40 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment against the Plaintiff Daniel Mecca and in favor of the Defendant Florida Health Services Center, Inc. d/b/a Tampa General Hospital. The Clerk is directed to close this case and deny all pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/3/2014. (LN)
February 28, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant Florida Health Services Center, Inc.'s Bill of Costs (Dkt. #54) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter a BILL OF COSTS against Plaintiff Daniel Mecca and in favor of Defendant Florida Health Services Center, Inc. in the amount of $4,366.97 for taxable costs. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/28/2014. (LN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mecca v. Florida Health Sciences Center, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Health Sciences Center, Inc.
Represented By: Janet Goldberg McEnery
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Mecca
Represented By: Antonios Poulos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]