Lederman v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Paul E. Lederman
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Alan L. Valadie and Stryker Orthopaedics Corp.
Case Number: 8:2013cv00506
Filed: February 22, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Manatee
Referring Judge: Anthony E. Porcelli
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand 17 is denied. The claims against Defendant Dr. Alan L. Valadie are dismissed without prejudice and the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Defendant Dr. Alan L. Valadie from this case. Defendant Dr. Alan L. Valadie's Motion to Dismiss 8 is denied as moot. Plaintiff shall file a response to HOC's Motion to Dismiss 12 on or before April 22, 2013. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/10/2013. (LN)
June 19, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant Howmedica Osteonics Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint 31 is granted without prejudice to Plaintiff to amend his complaint. Plaintiff shall file his second amended complaint within 14 days. Failure to file a second amended complaint by this time shall result in the closure of this case without further notice. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/19/2013. (LN)
August 12, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court 60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All pending motions are denied as moot. Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 8/12/2013. (LN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lederman v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul E. Lederman
Represented By: Matthew Erjavec
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Represented By: Rebecca A. Ocariz
Represented By: Iain L.C. Kennedy
Represented By: Iain L. C. Kennedy
Represented By: Hildy M. Sastre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan L. Valadie
Represented By: Bryan R. Snyder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Orthopaedics Corp.
Represented By: Hildy M. Sastre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]