Hearn v. International Business Machines

Plaintiff: Betty Hearn
Defendant: International Business Machines
Case Number: 8:2013cv00827
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A. Jenkins
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, For More Definite Statement 9 is GRANTED. The complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff to file an amended complaint that conforms to the pleading requirements set for th in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within 20 days. If Plaintiff fails to file a timely amended complaint, the Court will direct the Clerk to administratively close this case without further notice to the parties. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/10/2013. (LN)
October 1, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint or For More Definite Statement 19 is granted. Counts One, Two and Four are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a cause of action. Plaintiff's Title VII and FCRA claims are dismissed with prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Plaintiff's §1981 claims are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint in compliance with this Order within 14 days. If Plaintiff does not file a Second Amended Complaint within 14 days, the Court shall dismiss this action and close the case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 10/1/2013. (LN)
November 15, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint With Prejudice 26 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. All pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk is instructed to close this file. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 11/15/2013. (LN)
December 31, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial, Altering or Amending Judgment (Dkt. #33) is DENIED. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 12/31/2013. (LN)
January 10, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, Demand for Jury Trial and for Substitution. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 1/10/2014. (LN)
February 18, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to Appeal. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/18/2014. (LN)
April 24, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Quash Service of Process (Dkt. 3) is GRANTED. Defendant's counsel shall inform Plaintiff within seven (7) days of this Order if he is willing to accept service on Defendant's behalf. If Defendant's counsel is not willing to accept service, Plaintiff shall serve Defendant in compliance with Rule 4 as described herein. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/24/2013. (LN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hearn v. International Business Machines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Hearn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines
Represented By: Donald C. Works, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]