Pearson v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. et al

Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. and Bank of America Corporation
Plaintiff: Joel T. Pearson
Case Number: 8:2013cv01075
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Sarasota
Referring Judge: Anthony E. Porcelli
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Kovachevich
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part 7 Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 3/12/2014.(rjm)
February 6, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Defendants' Joint Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial. The jury trial waiver located in the loan documents is conspicuous, plainly worded so as not to require any special education to understand, and there is no evidence the Plaintiff was in a weaker bargaining position and unable to negotiate terms of the contract. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 2/6/2015. (rjm)
February 10, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion to Strike as procedurally untimely. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 2/10/2015. (rjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: J. Randolph Liebler
Represented By: Marc Thomas Parrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: J. Randolph Liebler
Represented By: Marc Thomas Parrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel T. Pearson
Represented By: Rodney L. Salvati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.