Munch v. Credit Protection Association, LP et al

Plaintiff: William Munch
Defendant: Credit Protection Association, LP and Comcast of Tallahassee, LLC
Case Number: 8:2013cv01179
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Hillsborough
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Kovachevich
Referring Judge: Thomas G. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting in Part 55 Report and Recommendations; Granting in Part Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court adopts the entirety of the Report and Recommendations with the exception of the determination of fees for attorney-client communications, and reduces that portion of the fees to the equivalent of 8.8 hours at $350 per hour. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 9/24/2014. (rjm)
March 18, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Defendant Comcast's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint before 5:00pm on March 27, 2015. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 3/18/2015. (rjm)
March 31, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 63 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 62 MOTION for Taxation of Costs For Supplemental Work In Support of Report and Recommendation of Attorney Fees filed by William Munch., denying Motion. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 3/31/2015. (JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munch v. Credit Protection Association, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Munch
Represented By: Frederick Wiley Vollrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Protection Association, LP
Represented By: Robert E. Sickles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast of Tallahassee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]