Lane et al v. Quicken Loans Inc. et al

Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc. and John Does
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Lane and Joseph D. Lane
 
Case Number: 8:2013cv01271
Filed: May 13, 2013
 
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Pinellas
Referring Judge: Anthony E. Porcelli
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER: Defendant Quicken Loans Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Verified Complaint and For Injunctive Relief 19 is granted. Plaintiffs' Third Amended Verified Complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to QUICKEN LOANS, INC. Plaintiffs' Motion to Drop Party Defendant 15 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 10/3/2013. (LN)
January 14, 2014 32 Featured Case ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Quiet Title Complaint (Dkt. #30) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint is dismissed without leave to amend. The Clerk is directed to deny all pending motions as moot and close the case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 1/14/2014. (LN)
February 21, 2014 34 Featured Case ORDER denying 33 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/21/2014. (LN)
June 12, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER: Defendant Quicken Loans Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Verified Complaint to Quiet Title 4 is GRANTED. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint that states a cause of action within 20 days of the date of this Order. If Plaintiffs fail to file a timely amended complaint, the Court will direct the Clerk to administratively close this case without further notice to the parties. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/12/2013. (LN)
July 10, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. All pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/10/2013. (LN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lane et al v. Quicken Loans Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc.
Represented By: Julie S. Sneed
Represented By: Latasha C. Marshall-Scott
Represented By: William P. Heller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Lane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph D. Lane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]